Rios-Rodriguez v. Department of Justice of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico et al
Plaintiff: Luis A. Rios-Rodriguez
Defendant: Hon. Lizardo W. Mattei-Roman and Department of Justice of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Case Number: 3:2021cv01290
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 USCA Case Number 21-1578 for #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Luis A. Rios-Rodriguez. (mcm)
July 29, 2021 Filing 7 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #6 Notice of Appeal [Docket Entries 4, 5 & 6] (mcm)
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT In light of the Courts Order, ECF No.4, judgment is hereby entered DISMISSING the Complaint sua sponte as failing to state a cause of action under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b)(6). Signed by Clerk on 7/19/2021.(rim)
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 4 Order, #5 Clerk's Judgment, by Luis A. Rios-Rodriguez.(rim)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #2 Complaint, filed by Luis A. Rios-Rodriguez. This complaint is dismissed sua sponte as failing to state a cause of action under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b)(6) insofar as it complains of judicial action, the judge is entitled to judicial immunity." Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/25/2021.(EES)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/25/2021. (EES)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Department of Justice of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Lizardo W. Mattei-Roman, filed by Luis A. Rios-Rodriguez, pro se. Service due by 9/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Complaint from State Court in Spanish, #4 Notification from State Court in Spanish, #5 Sentence from State Court in Spanish)(rim)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Luis A. Rios-Rodriguez, pro se. Responses due by 7/1/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (rim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rios-Rodriguez v. Department of Justice of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Lizardo W. Mattei-Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis A. Rios-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?