USA v. $29,117.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $29,117.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Case Number: 3:2021cv01296
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1341
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Filing 8 Warrant Issued to arrest property as to $29,117.00 in U.S. Currency. (Attachments: #1 Warrant of Arrest in Rem) (ad) Modified docket text on 7/2/2021 (rim).
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem Signed by Judge William G. Young on 7/1/2021. (EES)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Restrict Signed by Judge William G. Young on 7/1/2021. (EES)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem filed by Myriam Y. Fernandez-Gonzalez on behalf of USA Responses due by 7/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fernandez-Gonzalez, Myriam)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 ***EX-PARTE***AFFIDAVIT Unsworn Declaration by USA. (Fernandez-Gonzalez, Myriam)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Restrict Document Unsworn Declaration filed by Myriam Y. Fernandez-Gonzalez on behalf of USA Responses due by 7/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-Gonzalez, Myriam)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Forfeiture In Rem against $29,117.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY, filed by USA. Service due by 9/20/2021, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fernandez-Gonzalez, Myriam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $29,117.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $29,117.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Myriam Y. Fernandez-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?