easyGroup LTD v. Easyway-SBH
Plaintiff: easyGroup LTD
Defendant: Easyway-SBH
Case Number: 3:2021cv01304
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1127
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION Submitting Evidence as to Service of Process Through Alternative Service Methods re: 8 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #6 Summons Issued filed by Maristella Collazo-Soto on behalf of easyGroup LTD Responses due by 9/3/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cover letter accompanying the Documents, stamped by the Department of States Legal Affairs Office, #2 Exhibit B - Service Documents Sent on August 9, 2021, FedEx Delivery Confirmation)(Related document(s) 8 , #6 ) (Collazo-Soto, Maristella)
July 19, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement byeasyGroup LTD. (Collazo-Soto, Maristella)
July 19, 2021 Filing 12 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification), filed by easyGroup LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Additional Trademarks)(Collazo-Soto, Maristella)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #10 Motion to Appear PHV Signed by Judge William G. Young on 7/14/2021. (EES)
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 Motion to allow Francesca Russo to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7374473) filed by Maristella Collazo-Soto on behalf of easyGroup LTD Responses due by 7/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Collazo-Soto, Maristella)
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 Motion to allow Jorge Espinosa to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7374457) filed by Maristella Collazo-Soto on behalf of easyGroup LTD Responses due by 7/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Collazo-Soto, Maristella)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Signed by Judge William G. Young on 7/7/2021. (EES)
July 1, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Serve Easyway-SBH by Alternative Methods of Service and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support re #1 Complaint, filed by easyGroup LTD filed by Maristella Collazo-Soto on behalf of easyGroup LTD Responses due by 7/15/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Collazo-Soto, Maristella)
June 29, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Easyway-SBH (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
June 28, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION Submitting Summons as to Easyway-SBH re: #4 Notice of Defective Filing filed by Maristella Collazo-Soto on behalf of easyGroup LTD Responses due by 7/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons as to Easyway-SBH)(Related document(s) #4 ) (Collazo-Soto, Maristella)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Summons submitted is not in the form prescribed by U.S. District Court for such purpose as approved by the Court effective June 2012 (AO 440) Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 6/29/2021. (arg)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheila M. Cruz-Rodriguez on behalf of easyGroup LTD (Cruz-Rodriguez, Sheila)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Easyway-SBH ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7353451.), filed by easyGroup LTD. Service due by 9/23/2021, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons by Publication as to Easyway-SBH)(Collazo-Soto, Maristella)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: easyGroup LTD v. Easyway-SBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: easyGroup LTD
Represented By: Sheila M. Cruz-Rodriguez
Represented By: Maristella Collazo-Soto
Represented By: Francesca Russo
Represented By: Jorge Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easyway-SBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?