Sunnova Energy Corporation v. Solar Roots LLC
Plaintiff: Sunnova Energy Corporation
Defendant: Solar Roots LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01306
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Referring Judge: Giselle Lopez-Soler
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: GRANTED, as stipulated by the parties. See the parties' joint motion at Docket No. 17, and the preliminary injunction issued by the Court at Docket No. 18. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/21/2021. (brc)
July 20, 2021 Filing 18 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re #17 Motion in Compliance. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/20/2021. (brc)
July 20, 2021 Filing 17 Joint Motion In Compliance with Court Order for Joint Filing of Proposed Preliminary Injunction filed by Sonia M. Lopez-Del Valle on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation , Solar Roots LLC Responses due by 8/3/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed Preliminary Injunction)(Lopez-Del Valle, Sonia) Modified on 7/20/2021 to add filer (ab).
July 14, 2021 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler:Case called for Preliminary Injunction but not held on 7/14/2021. Present were Atty. Alejandro Cepeda, Atty. Isabel Torres and Atty. Sonia Lopez for Plaintiff and Atty. Peter John Porrata for Defendant. The parties informed the Court that they reached an agreement for the issuance of an Order for a Preliminary Injunction and requested 10 days to file a Joint Motion with the proposed Order. The Court granted the request. Joint Motion to be filed by July 25, 2021. (Court Reporter DCR.) Hearing set for 9:00 AM. Hearing started at 9:18 AM. Hearing ended at 9:51 AM. (rom)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 Motion for Leave to Appear, Request for Continuance and for Disclosure. The hearing will begin as scheduled on July 14, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are ordered to exchange copies of documents to be used during the hearing and to exchange a list of potential witnesses, as well as a brief summary of their expected testimony, by today at 2:00 p.m. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 7/13/2021. (NV)
July 13, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation Re: #13 First MOTION for Leave to Appear request for continuance and for disclosure of the names of the defendants witnesses, with a statement as to what will they be testifying to, at the injucntion hearing and a request for the production of the documents filed by Solar Roots LLC filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation. (Torres-Sastre, Isabel)
July 12, 2021 Filing 13 First MOTION for Leave to Appear request for continuance and for disclosure of the names of the defendants witnesses, with a statement as to what will they be testifying to, at the injucntion hearing and a request for the production of the documents they intend to introduce in evidence filed by Peter John Porrata on behalf of Solar Roots LLC Responses due by 7/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Porrata, Peter)
July 8, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Alejandro J. Cepeda-Diaz on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation (Cepeda-Diaz, Alejandro)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Noted #10 Informative Motion. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 7/1/2021. (NV)
July 1, 2021 Filing 10 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Service of Process in Compliance with the Order at Docket No. 8 filed by Sonia M. Lopez-Del Valle on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation Responses due by 7/15/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez-Del Valle, Sonia)
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sunnova Energy Corporation upon Solar Roots LLC served on 7/1/2021, answer due 7/22/2021. (Lopez-Del Valle, Sonia) Modified on 7/1/2021 to correct dates of service (ab).
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 7/14/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler. Plaintiff is ordered to serve Defendant with summons, Verified Complaint, Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and a copy of this Order by Friday, July 2, 2021. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 6/29/2021. (hgp)
June 29, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification), filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation.(Lopez-Del Valle, Sonia)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to U.S. Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler for preliminary hearing and Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 6/29/2021.(om)
June 29, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Solar Roots LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
June 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonia M. Lopez-Del Valle on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation (Lopez-Del Valle, Sonia)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Isabel Torres-Sastre on behalf of Sunnova Energy Corporation Responses due by 7/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torres-Sastre, Isabel)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Solar Roots LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7355683.), filed by Sunnova Energy Corporation. Service due by 9/27/2021, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Torres-Sastre, Isabel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunnova Energy Corporation v. Solar Roots LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solar Roots LLC
Represented By: Peter John Porrata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunnova Energy Corporation
Represented By: Isabel Torres-Sastre
Represented By: Sonia M. Lopez-Del Valle
Represented By: Alejandro J. Cepeda-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?