DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc v. Stewart Title Guaranty Company
Plaintiff: DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc
Defendant: Stewart Title Guaranty Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv01318
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia L Carreno-Coll
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for extension of time. Answer to the Complaint deadline by 9/6/2021. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 8/6/201. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
August 5, 2021 Filing 10 First MOTION for extension of time until September 6, 2021 to Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Fabian Rodriguez-Torres on behalf of Stewart Title Guaranty Company Responses due by 8/19/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Torres, Fabian)
August 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Fabian Rodriguez-Torres on behalf of Stewart Title Guaranty Company (Rodriguez-Torres, Fabian)
August 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Perez-Ochoa on behalf of Stewart Title Guaranty Company (Perez-Ochoa, Eric)
July 19, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc upon Stewart Title Guaranty Company served on 7/16/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Carazo-Gonzalez, Jorge)
July 9, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Stewart Title Guaranty Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Civil Cover Sheet signed (Carazo-Gonzalez, Jorge)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll. (vdm)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #1 Complaint, filed by DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc (Carazo-Gonzalez, Jorge)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notice by Omar J. Hopgood-Munoz on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc (Hopgood-Munoz, Omar)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stewart Title Guaranty Company ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7367996.), filed by DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. Service due by 10/6/2021, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Policy, #4 Exhibit Promissory Note, #5 Exhibit First Mortgage, #6 Exhibit Title Claim Letter, #7 Exhibit Acknowledgment Letter, #8 Exhibit Stewart Letter, #9 Exhibit Payoff Quote)(Carazo-Gonzalez, Jorge)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc v. Stewart Title Guaranty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc
Represented By: Omar J. Hopgood-Munoz
Represented By: Jorge M. Carazo-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Title Guaranty Company
Represented By: Eric Perez-Ochoa
Represented By: Fabian Rodriguez-Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?