Crespo-Rentas et al v. Metro Pavia Health System, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jose Crespo-Rentas and Francisco Crespo-Caraballo
Defendant: Metro Pavia Health System, Inc. d/b/a Dr Pila Metropolitan Hospital, Blanca Fernandez-Rodriguez, John Doe, Conjugal Partnership Fernandez-Doe, Santiago Baez-Torres, Jane Doe, Conjugal Partnership Baez-Doe, Manuel Morell-Cataquet, Jane Smith, Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company, Triple S Propiedad, SINDICATO DE ASEGURADORES PARA LA SUSCRIPCION CONJUNTA DE SEGUROS DE RESPONSABILIDAD MEDICO HOSPITALARIA (SIMED), XYZ Insurance Companies, John Smith, Richard Smith, XYZ Entities, XYZ Companies, Metro Pavia Health System, Inc. doing business as Dr. Pila Metropolitan Hospital, Conjugal Partnership Doe-Fernandez, Sindicato de Aseguradoras para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Seguro de Responsabilidad Medico Hospitalaria (SIMED) and Conjugal Partnership Morell-Smith
Case Number: 3:2021cv01321
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for extension of time until 10/02/2021 to ANSWER COMPLAINT filed by Benjamin Morales-Del-Valle on behalf of Sindicato de Aseguradoras para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Seguro de Responsabilidad Medico Hospitalaria (SIMED) Responses due by 9/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Morales-Del-Valle, Benjamin)
August 27, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to dismiss without prejudice as to Sindicato de Aseguradoras para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Seguro de Responsabilidad Medico Hospitalaria (SIMED) filed by Alicia Margarita Santos-Irizarry on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Santos-Irizarry, Alicia)
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/26/21 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Francisco Crespo-Caraballo, Jose Crespo-Rentas filed by Jose A. Gonzalez-Villamil on behalf of Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company Responses due by 9/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Gonzalez-Villamil, Jose)
August 27, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 27, 2021 to File Answer to the complaint filed by Doris Quinones-Tridas on behalf of Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company Responses due by 9/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Quinones-Tridas, Doris)
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 15, 2021 to File Answer or otherwise plead re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Francisco Crespo-Caraballo, Jose Crespo-Rentas filed by Miguel G. Laffitte on behalf of Triple S Propiedad Responses due by 9/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Laffitte, Miguel)
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Disclosure pursuant to FRCP 7.1 filed by Miguel G. Laffitte on behalf of Triple S Propiedad Responses due by 9/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Laffitte, Miguel)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Miguel G. Laffitte on behalf of Triple S Propiedad. (Laffitte, Miguel) Modified docket text and event on 8/25/2021 (rim).
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Santiago Baez-Torres, Conjugal Partnership Baez-Doe, Conjugal Partnership Doe-Fernandez, Conjugal Partnership Morell-Smith, Jane Doe, John Doe, Blanca Fernandez-Rodriguez, Metro Pavia Health System, Inc., Manuel Morell-Cataquet, Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company, Sindicato de Aseguradoras para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Seguro de Responsabilidad Medico Hospitalaria (SIMED), Jane Smith, Triple S Propiedad (arg) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/14/2021) (rim). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2021: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim).
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 Payment of Electronic Filing Fee( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7372973.) re #1 Complaint,,, filed by Francisco Crespo-Caraballo, Jose Crespo-Rentas, filed by Francisco Crespo-Caraballo, Jose Crespo-Rentas. Related document: #1 Complaint,,, filed by Francisco Crespo-Caraballo, Jose Crespo-Rentas.(Santos-Irizarry, Alicia)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Francisco Crespo-Caraballo, Jose Crespo-Rentas. Service due by 10/12/2021, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Metro Pavia, #4 Summons Blanca Fernandez, #5 Summons John Doe, #6 Summons Conjugal Partnership Fernandez-Doe, #7 Summons Santiago Baez, #8 Summons Jane Doe, #9 Summons Conjugal Partnership Baez-Doe, #10 Summons Manuel Morell, #11 Summons Jane Smith, #12 Summons Morell-Smith, #13 Summons Puerto Rico Medical Defense, #14 Summons Triple S Propiedad, #15 Summons SIMED)(Santos-Irizarry, Alicia) Modified docket text on 7/14/2021 (rim).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crespo-Rentas et al v. Metro Pavia Health System, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Crespo-Rentas
Represented By: Alicia Margarita Santos-Irizarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Crespo-Caraballo
Represented By: Alicia Margarita Santos-Irizarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Pavia Health System, Inc. d/b/a Dr Pila Metropolitan Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanca Fernandez-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Fernandez-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santiago Baez-Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Baez-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Morell-Cataquet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company
Represented By: Doris Quinones-Tridas
Represented By: Jose A. Gonzalez-Villamil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple S Propiedad
Represented By: Miguel G. Laffitte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SINDICATO DE ASEGURADORES PARA LA SUSCRIPCION CONJUNTA DE SEGUROS DE RESPONSABILIDAD MEDICO HOSPITALARIA (SIMED)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Entities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Pavia Health System, Inc. doing business as Dr. Pila Metropolitan Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Doe-Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sindicato de Aseguradoras para la Suscripcion Conjunta de Seguro de Responsabilidad Medico Hospitalaria (SIMED)
Represented By: Benjamin Morales-Del-Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Morell-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?