Rodriguez Plumbing Contractors, Inc. v. OAC Action Construction, Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Rodriguez Plumbing Contractors, Inc.
Defendant: OAC Action Construction, Corp. and Allied World Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv01323
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1352
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER/CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER1.The case will be trial ready by October 20222.A joint final pre-trial memorandum will be filed by September 1, 2022 3.Discovery will be completed by June 30, 20224.Dispositive motions will be filed by June 30, 20225.Preserving all parties rights, they shall, within thirty days of the date of this order, file a joint proposed case management scheduling order consistent with the above dates. The parties may agree to advance these dates but may not agree to delay them.6.No motion for a continuance will be entertained that does not recite the above dates and explain how and why any such continuance will affect them.SO ORDERED.Signed by Judge William G. Young on 9/8/2021.(EES)
September 1, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz on behalf of Defendants Allied World Insurance Company, OAC Action Construction, Corp..(Rodriguez-Munoz, Julian)
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Jorge I. Peirats on behalf of OAC Action Construction, Corp. Responses due by 9/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Peirats, Jorge)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Answer deadline due by 8/24/2021. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 8/24/2021. (EES)
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Entry as to Allied World Insurance Company filed by Jose O. Ramos-Gonzalez on behalf of Rodriguez Plumbing Contractors, Inc. Responses due by 9/1/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support of Request, #2 Exhibit Entry of Default)(Ramos-Gonzalez, Jose)
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Jorge I. Peirats on behalf of OAC Action Construction, Corp. Responses due by 8/24/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Peirats, Jorge)
July 21, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rodriguez Plumbing Contractors, Inc. upon All Defendants. (Ramos-Gonzalez, Jose)
July 14, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Allied World Insurance Company, OAC Action Construction, Corp. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Judge William G. Young (arg)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Ramos-Gonzalez, Jose)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Under the Provisions of the Bonds Statute against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7373871.), filed by Rodriguez Plumbing Contractors, Inc.. Service due by 10/12/2021,(Ramos-Gonzalez, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez Plumbing Contractors, Inc. v. OAC Action Construction, Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodriguez Plumbing Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Jose O. Ramos-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OAC Action Construction, Corp.
Represented By: Jorge I. Peirats
Represented By: Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Insurance Company
Represented By: Julian R. Rodriguez-Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?