Colon-Cartagena et al v. Bayamon Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Victor M Colon-Cartagena and Victor G Colon-Gonzalez
Defendant: Bayamon Medical Center, Dr. Miguel Agrait, Luis Cintron and Emergency Room Administrative Services LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01333
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until October 13, 2021 to file answer or to otherwise plead filed by Michael C. McCall on behalf of Bayamon Medical Center Responses due by 9/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (McCall, Michael)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Miguel Agrait, Bayamon Medical Center, Luis Cintron, Emergency Room Administrative Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. (vdm)
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7382363.), filed by Victor M Colon-Cartagena, Victor G Colon-Gonzalez. Service due by 10/18/2021, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Bayamon Medical Center, #4 Summons Emergency Room, #5 Summons Luis Cintron, #6 Summons Miguel Agrait)(Davila-Diaz, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colon-Cartagena et al v. Bayamon Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor M Colon-Cartagena
Represented By: Juan R. Davila-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor G Colon-Gonzalez
Represented By: Juan R. Davila-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayamon Medical Center
Represented By: Michael C. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Miguel Agrait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Cintron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emergency Room Administrative Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?