Pillot-Ocasio v. Trinity Services International LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Pillot-Ocasio
Defendant: Trinity Services International LLC and Departamento de Correccion y Rehabilitacion
Case Number: 3:2021cv01364
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Denied as unnecessary #8 "Second Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis." The request was already granted by the court at Docket No. 4. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/9/2021. (ebb)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: #6 Pro se "Letter in Compliance." The request for appointment of a court interpreter is DENIED. The court does not provide court interpreter in civil cases. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/9/2021. (ebb)
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 Second MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carlos Pillot-Ocasio, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Envelope)(mcm)
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Departamento de Correccion y Rehabilitacion, Trinity Services International LLC, filed by Carlos Pillot-Ocasio, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mcm)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 Motion In Compliance as to 4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION requesting translator filed by Carlos Pillot-Ocasio, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(Related document(s) 4 ) (mcm)
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Departamento de Correccion y Rehabilitacion, Trinity Services International LLC through the US Marshals with copy or Order, copy of Complaint and USM 285. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 USM 285) (ad)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting #1 "Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis." The U.S. Marshals shall serve process accordingly. Plaintiff is granted until September 13, 2021, refile the documents submitted at Docket No. 3 in English or submit a certified English translation of the complaint and all of the supporting documents as required by 48 U.S.C. 864 ("[a]ll pleadings and proceedings in the United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico shall be conducted in the English language") and Local Rule 5(g) ("[a]ll documents not in the English language which are presented or filed, whether as evidence or otherwise, must be accompanied by a certified translation into English prepared by an interpreter certified by the Administrative Office of the United States Courts"). Failure to comply may result in dismissal of the complaint. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/12/2021. (ebb)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Departamento de Correccion y Rehabilitacion, Trinity Services International LLC, filed by Carlos Pillot-Ocasio, Pro Se. Service due by 11/9/2021, (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(ad)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 ***RESTRICTED*** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Carlos Pillot-Ocasio, Pro Se. (ad)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carlos Pillot-Ocasio, Pro Se. Responses due by 8/25/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pillot-Ocasio v. Trinity Services International LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Pillot-Ocasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Services International LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Departamento de Correccion y Rehabilitacion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?