Rodriguez Velez et al v. Pierluisi-Urrutia
Plaintiff: Zulay Rodriguez Velez, Yohama Gonzalez Milan, Leila G Ginorio, Julissa Pinero, Zulay Rodriguez-Velez, Yohama Gonzalez-Milan and Leila G. Ginorio-Carrasquillo
Defendant: Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia
Amicus Curiae: Asociacion de Alcaldes de Puerto Rico and Liberty Justice Center
Case Number: 3:2021cv01366
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia Re: #92 MOTION requesting Order for Taking of Judicial Knowledge filed by Leila G. Ginorio-Carrasquillo, Zulay Rodriguez-Velez, Julissa Pinero, Yohama Gonzalez-Milan filed by Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia. (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER: Noting #108 "Second Motion Submitting Certified Translations of Plaintiffs' Exhibits." See attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/8/2021. (ebb)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER: Granting #107 "Brief Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Judicial Knowledge." Response due by 10/8/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/07/2021. (LMR)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Second MOTION Submitting certified English translations re: #86 Exhibit List,, filed by Leila G. Ginorio-Carrasquillo, Zulay Rodriguez-Velez, Julissa Pinero, Yohama Gonzalez-Milan filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17, #2 Exhibit 22, #3 Exhibit 26)(Related document(s) #86 ) (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION for extension of time until October 8, 2021 to respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Judicial Knowledge filed by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 10/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Day Five, held on 09/27/2021, before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Court Reporter Cindy Lee Brown, Telephone number (787) 772-3478. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be available electronically to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located at www.prd.uscourts.gov.. Redaction Request due 10/28/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2022. (clb)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER: Noting #103 "First Motion Submitting Certified Translations of Plaintiffs' Exhibits Nos. 1, 6, and 13-15." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/6/2021. (ebb)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Day Three, held on 09/23/2021, before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Court Reporter Cindy Lee Brown, Telephone number (787) 772-3478. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be available electronically to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located at www.prd.uscourts.gov.. Redaction Request due 10/27/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2022. (clb)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 First MOTION Submitting certified English translations re: #86 Exhibit List,, filed by Leila G. Ginorio-Carrasquillo, Zulay Rodriguez-Velez, Julissa Pinero, Yohama Gonzalez-Milan filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/20/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 13, #4 Exhibit 14, #5 Exhibit 15)(Related document(s) #86 ) (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER: Noting #101 "Informative Motion in Compliance with Order Indicating the Specific Number of Cases for Exhibits D&E." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/06/2021. (LMR)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Motion In Compliance with Order Indicating the Specific Number of Cases for Defendants Exhibits D & E filed by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 10/20/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Day Two, held on 09/22/2021, before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Court Reporter Cindy Lee Brown, Telephone number (787) 772-3478. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be available electronically to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located at www.prd.uscourts.gov.. Redaction Request due 10/27/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2022. (clb)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 BRIEF of Amicus Curiae Liberty Justice Center in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Liberty Justice Center. (Bague-Soto, Jose)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER: Granting #97 "Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae Liberty Justice Center in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/4/2021. (ebb)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MOTION for Leave to File Document filed by Jose A. Bague-Soto on behalf of Liberty Justice Center Responses due by 10/18/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Curiae Brief of the Liberty Justice Center in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Bague-Soto, Jose)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER: Denying without prejudice #93 "Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Amicus Curiae Liberty Justice Center." There is no pending leave to appear as amicus curiae from the Liberty Justice Center. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/4/2021. (LMR)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER re: #92 "Plaintiffs' Motion for Judicial Knowledge." Defendant shall respond not later than 10/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/4/2021.(LMR)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER: Noting #90 "Motion Submitting Expert Report and Curriculum Vitae of Dr. Joel Hay." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/4/2021. (LMR)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Motion to allow Jeffrey D. Jennings to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7473827) filed by Jose A. Bague-Soto on behalf of Liberty Justice Center Responses due by 10/18/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bague-Soto, Jose)
October 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION requesting Order for Taking of Judicial Knowledge filed by Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/18/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauermeister-Fernandez, Arturo)
October 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Day One - P.M. Session EXCERPT #2, Proceedings held on 09/21/2021, before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Court Reporter Cindy Lee Brown, Telephone number (787) 772-3478. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be available electronically to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located at www.prd.uscourts.gov.. Redaction Request due 10/25/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/2/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2022. (clb)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION Submitting Expert Report and Curriculum Vitae of Dr. Joel Hay filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Leila G. Ginorio-Carrasquillo, Yohama Gonzalez-Milan, Julissa Pinero, Zulay Rodriguez-Velez Responses due by 10/15/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Report of Dr. Joel Hay, #2 Exhibit Curriculum Vitae of Sr. Joel Hay)(Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER: Noting #88 "Motion Submitting Certified English Translations of Defendant's Exhibits." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/1/2021. (LMR)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION Submitting english translations Defendants Exhibit I and J filed by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 10/15/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants Exhibit I and J)(Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #78 Motion to allow Jeffrey D. Jennings to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7473827). ***FILED IN ERROR - PHV applicant signed using electronic signature. Application to Appear as a PHV must be hand singed by applicant.*** (mcm)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT LIST by Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J). (vso)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBIT LIST by Zulay Rodriguez-Velez, Yohama Gonzalez-Milan, Leila G. Ginorio-Carrasquillo, and Julissa Pinero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4-1 to 4-27, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9-1 to 9-3, #10 Exhibit 10-1 to 10-2, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13-1 to 13-5, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17-1 to 17-4, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20-1 to 20-2, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23-1 to 23-2, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26). (vso)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez: Final Day of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 9/30/2021. Present for Plaintiffs were attorneys Jose R. Davila-Acevedo, Ilya Shapiro (remotely), and Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez (remotely). Present for Defendant were attorneys Joel Torres-Ortiz, Idza Diaz-Rivera, and Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez. See Minute Entry attached. (Court Reporter Cindy Brown.) Hearing set 10:00 AM. Hearing started 10:10 AM. Hearing ended 2:19 PM. (vso)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ***FILED IN ERROR - PHV applicant signed using electronic signature.*** Motion to allow Jeffrey D. Jennings to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7473827) filed by Jose A. Bague-Soto on behalf of Liberty Justice Center Responses due by 10/14/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bague-Soto, Jose) Modified on 10/1/2021 (mcm).
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Day Three - P.M. Session EXCERPT, held on 09/23/2021, before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Court Reporter Cindy Lee Brown, Telephone number (787) 772-3478. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be available electronically to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located at www.prd.uscourts.gov.. Redaction Request due 10/20/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/1/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2021. (clb)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Day Two - P.M. Session Excerpt, held on 09/22/2021, before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Court Reporter Cindy Lee Brown, Telephone number (787) 772-3478. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be available electronically to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located at www.prd.uscourts.gov.. Redaction Request due 10/20/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/1/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2021. (clb)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez: Sixth Day of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 9/28/2021. Present for Plaintiffs were attorneys Jose R. Davila-Acevedo, Ilya Shapiro (remotely), and Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez (remotely). Present for Defendant were attorneys Joel Torres-Ortiz, Idza Diaz-Rivera, Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez, and Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz. See Minute Entry attached. Exhibits admitted: Plaintiffs' Exhibits #15, #16, #17, #18, #19, #20, #21, #22, #23, #24, #25, and #26. Defendant's Exhibits H, I, and J. Further Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 9/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. (Court Reporter Cindy Brown.) Interpreter Juan Segarra. Hearing set for 9:00 AM. Hearing started 9:01 AM. Hearing ended 5:46 PM. (vso)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez: Fifth Day of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 9/27/2021. Present for Plaintiffs were attorneys Jose R. Davila-Acevedo, Ilya Shapiro (remotely), and Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez (remotely). Present for Defendant were attorneys Joel Torres-Ortiz, Idza Diaz-Rivera, Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez, and Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz. See Minute Entry attached. Exhibits admitted: Plaintiffs' Exhibits #10, #11, #12, #13, and #14. Defendant's Exhibit G. Further Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 9/28/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. (Court Reporter Cindy Brown.) Interpreter Juan Segarra. Hearing set 9:00 AM. Hearing started 9:04 AM. Hearing ended 6:08 PM. (vso)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Defendants Re: #69 MOTION for Reconsideration (Partial) of Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Take Judicial Notice re 68 Order on Motion Submitting filed by Leila G. Ginorio-Carrasquillo, Zulay Rodriguez-Velez, Julissa Pinero, Yohama Gonzalez-Milan filed by All Defendants. (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
September 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Day One - P.M. Session EXCERPT held on 09/21/2021, before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Court Reporter Cindy Lee Brown, Telephone number (787) 772-3478. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be available electronically to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located at www.prd.uscourts.gov.. Redaction Request due 10/18/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/27/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2021. (clb)
September 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Day One - A.M. Session held on 09/21/2021, before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Court Reporter Cindy Lee Brown, Telephone number (787) 772-3478. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be available electronically to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located at www.prd.uscourts.gov.. Redaction Request due 10/18/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/27/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2021. (clb) (be).
September 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER re: #69 "Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Take Judicial Notice." Defendant shall respond not later than 5:00 p.m. on 9/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. The motion will be discussed during the housekeeping at the end of the preliminary injunction hearing. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/26/2021.(LMR)
September 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Day Four held on 09/24/2021, before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Court Reporter Cindy Lee Brown, Telephone number (787) 772-3478. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be available electronically to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located at www.prd.uscourts.gov.. Redaction Request due 10/18/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2021. (clb)
September 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 BRIEF of Amicus Curiae in Support of the Defendant by Asociacion de Alcaldes de Puerto Rico. (Martinez-Luciano, Jorge)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez: Fourth Day of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 9/24/2021. Present for Plaintiffs were attorneys Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez, Jose R. Davila-Acevedo, and Ilya Shapiro (remotely). Present for Defendant were attorneys Joel Torres-Ortiz, Idza Diaz-Rivera, Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez, and Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz. See Minute Entry attached. Exhibits admitted: Defendant's Exhibits A, B, C, D, E, and F. Further Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 9/27/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. (Court Reporter Cindy Brown.) Interpreter Juan Segarra. Hearing set for 9:00 AM. Hearing started 9:00 AM. Hearing ended 1:09 PM. (vso) Modified on 10/8/2021 to correct typo (mcm).
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION for Reconsideration (Partial) of Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Take Judicial Notice re 68 Order on Motion Submitting filed by Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/8/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 68 ) (Bauermeister-Fernandez, Arturo)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez: Third Day of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 9/23/2021. Present for Plaintiffs were attorneys Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez, Jose R. Davila-Acevedo, and Victor M. Rivera-Rios. Present for Defendant were attorneys Joel Torres-Ortiz, Idza Diaz-Rivera, Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez, and Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz. See Minute Entry attached. Exhibits admitted: Plaintiffs' Exhibits #7, #8, and #9. Further Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 9/24/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. (Court Reporter Cindy Brown.) Interpreter Juan Segarra. Hearing set 9:30 AM. Hearing started 9:36 AM. Hearing ended 6:09 PM. (vso)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: Granting as requested #66 "Motion to Take Judicial Notice." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/23/2021. (LMR)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: Noting #65 "Motion Submitting Certified English Translations." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/23/2021. (LMR)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION Submitting Motion to Take Judicial Notice filed by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia Responses due by 10/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION Submitting english translations filed by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 10/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez:Second day of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 9/22/2021. Present for Plaintiffs were attorneys Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez, Jose R. Davila-Acevedo, and Victor M. Rivera-Rios. Present for Defendant were attorneys Joel Torres-Ortiz, Idza Diaz-Rivera, Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez, and Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz. See Minute Entry attached. Exhibits admitted: Plaintiffs' Exhibits #5 and #6. Further Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 9/23/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. (Court Reporter Cindy Brown.) Interpreter Juan Segarra. Hearing set for 9:30 AM. Hearing started 10:08 AM. Hearing ended 5:45 PM. (vso)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: Granting #60 "Urgent Motion to Request Leave to file a Brief on Amicus Curiae Asociacion de Alcaldes de Puerto Rico in Support of the Defendant." The court expects the movant to file its brief "on a very short notice" as indicated on page 2 of the urgent motion, but not later than 5:00 p.m. September 25, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/22/2021. (LMR)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: Noting #62 "Motion In Compliance..." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/22/2021. (LMR)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Motion In Compliance with Order (Docket Number 61) as to 61 Order, filed by Jorge Martinez-Luciano on behalf of Asociacion de Alcaldes de Puerto Rico Responses due by 10/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 61 ) (Martinez-Luciano, Jorge)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER re: #60 "Urgent Motion to Request Leave to File a Brief of Amicus Curie Asociacion de Alcaldes de Puerto Rico in Support of the Defendant." Not later than 4:15 p.m. today, the moving party at Docket No. 60 shall clarify what it means by appearing amicus curie in favor of defendant. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/22/2021.(LMR)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File Document Re: Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of the Defendants filed by Jorge Martinez-Luciano on behalf of Asociacion de Alcaldes de Puerto Rico Responses due by 10/6/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Luciano, Jorge)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Minute Entry for Proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 9/21/2021. Present for Plaintiffs were attorneys Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez, Jose R. Davila-Acevedo, and Ilya Shapiro (remotely). Present for Defendant were attorneys Joel Torres-Ortiz, Idza Diaz-Rivera, Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez, and Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz. See Minute Entry attached. Exhibits admitted: Plaintiffs' Exhibits #1 (subject to the filing of a certified translation, not later than September 24, 2021), #2, #3 and #4. Further Preliminary Injunction Hearing to reconvene on 9/22/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. (Court Reporter Cindy Brown.) (Court Interpreter Juan Segarra.) Hearing set for 10:00. Hearing held at 10:39. Hearing ended at 05:53. (vso)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: Noting #56 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/21/2021.(LMR)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: Noting #57 "Amended Motion in Compliance with Order Requesting Plaintiffs to Set Forth Their Facial and As-Applied Challenges." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/21/2021. (LMR)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Amended Motion In Compliance re: ECF No. 50 filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios on behalf of Leila G. Ginorio-Carrasquillo, Yohama Gonzalez-Milan, Julissa Pinero, Zulay Rodriguez-Velez (Rivera-Rios, Victor)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez: Status Conference held via VTC on 9/20/2021. Present: For Plaintiffs, Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez, Ilya Shapiro, Jose R. Davila-Acevedo. For Defendant, Joel Torres-Ortiz, Idza Diaz-Rivera, Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez, Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz. Counsel for the parties were present via VTC and members of the press had access through teleconference. See Minute Entry attached. Hearing set for 02:30PM. Hearing started 02:37PM. Hearing ended 03:11PM. (Court Reporter Cindy Brown.) (vso)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: Noting #53 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/20/21. (LMR)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz on behalf of Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia (Ramirez-Ortiz, Juan)
September 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: The court has examined yesterday's filings (Docket Nos. 50 and 51), including the 32 identified factual stipulations, plaintiffs' 201 suggested stipulations and defendant's 41 suggested stipulations. As for plaintiffs' suggested stipulations nos. 9, 11, 12, 15, 18, 21, 22 and 23, the court encourages defendant to review and confirm what plaintiffs have suggested. In the court's view, these items refer to what may be easily ascertainable data included in personnel files. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 09/18/2021.(LMR)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Joint Motion In Compliance with the Minutes at Docket No. 19, item 2, the Minutes at Docket No. 44, and as to #18 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, filed by Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez on behalf of All Parties. Responses due by 10/1/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #18 ) (Bauermeister-Fernandez, Arturo) Modified on 9/20/2021 to add filer (mcm).
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Motion In Compliance with Order at the September 10 hearing, re: facial and as-applied challenges to EO 058 filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/1/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: See attached. In light of the COVID-19 Pandemic, the court expects strict compliance with these measures. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/17/2021.(LMR)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SURREPLY to Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bauermeister-Fernandez, Arturo)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: Granting #46 "Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Pages." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/15/2021. (LMR)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia Responses due by 9/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by All Defendants Re: #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia filed by All Defendants. (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez:Status Conference held via VTC on 9/10/2021. Present: For Plaintiffs, attorneys Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez, Ilya Shapiro, and Jose R. Davila-Acevedo. For Defendant, attorneys Joel Torres-Ortiz, Idza Diaz-Rivera, and Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez. Counsel for the parties were present via VTC and members of the press had access through teleconference. See Minute Entry attached. Preliminary injunction hearing set for September 21, 2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Prehearing conference set for September 20, 2021 at 2:30 PM via VTC before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Not later than September 17, 2021, parties shall file a joint informative motion in the format specified at Docket Entry 18-1. The court advised the parties that arrangements need to be made with the courtroom deputy clerk if someone wishes to be present via VTC during the preliminary injunction hearing. Hearing set for 10:00 AM. Hearing started at 10:10 AM. Hearing ended at 10:25 AM. (Court Reporter Cindy Brown.) (vso)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: Granting #41 "Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Pages." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/10/2021. (LMR)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bauermeister-Fernandez, Arturo)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 9/23/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SURREPLY to Reply to Opposition filed by All Defendants Re: #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Leila G. Ginorio-Carrasquillo, Zulay Rodriguez-Velez, Julissa Pinero, Yohama Gonzalez-Milan filed by All Defendants. (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: Noting #38 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/8/2021.(LMR)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez on behalf of All Defendants (Cintron-Rodriguez, Jose)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Granting #33 "Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/8/2021. (LMR)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: Granting #31 "Motion for Leave to File in the Spanish Language." Certified Translations due on 9/21/2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/8/2021. (LMR)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: Noting #30 "Informative Motion in Compliance with Order at Docket No. 27 Indicating the Sources and Sections in the 'Whereas' Sections of Executive Order No. 2021-058." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/8/2021. (LMR)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: Noting #29 "Informative Motion in Compliance with Order at Docket No. 27..." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/8/2021. (LMR)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re: ECF No. 32 - Reply to Opp. to Preliminary Injunction Motion filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Leila G. Ginorio-Carrasquillo, Yohama Gonzalez-Milan, Julissa Pinero, Zulay Rodriguez-Velez Re: #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Leila G. Ginorio-Carrasquillo, Zulay Rodriguez-Velez, Julissa Pinero, Yohama Gonzalez-Milan filed by Leila G. Ginorio-Carrasquillo, Yohama Gonzalez-Milan, Julissa Pinero, Zulay Rodriguez-Velez. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Plaintiffs' Update on COVID-19 Empirical Data and Statistical Analysis)(Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 9/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Motion In Compliance Indicating The Sources and Sections in the "Whereas" Sections Of Executive Order 2021-058 as to 27 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, filed by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 9/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 27 ) (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Motion In Compliance Regarding Specific Paragraphs of The Amended Complaint That, In Defendants View, Should Be Considered "Well Pleaded" For Purposes of Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) as to 27 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, filed by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 9/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 27 ) (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: A Status Conference is hereby set for 9/10/2021 at 10:00 a.m. in VTC Bridge PAD before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Additional instructions with respect to the VTC will be notified to record counsel. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/3/2021.(LMR)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Not later than Tuesday, September 7, 2021, defendant shall file: (i) an Informative Motion listing the specific paragraphs of the Amended Complaint that, in his view, should be considered "well pleaded" for purposes of Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6); and (ii) a motion indicating the source(s) and section(s) therein of the empirical, statistical and scientific data included in the "Whereas" sections of Executive Order 2021-058. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/1/2021.(LMR)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re: #20 "Motion to Dismiss" and #22 "Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction." See attached for deadlines. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/1/2021.(LMR)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Granting #23 "Motion for Leave to File Response in Opposition to Preliminary Injunction in Excess Pages." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/1/2021. (LMR)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Granting #21 "Motion for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss in Excess Pages." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/1/2021. (LMR)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Document in Excess Pages filed by Idza Diaz-Rivera on behalf of Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia Responses due by 9/14/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Diaz-Rivera, Idza)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia Re: #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Leila G. Ginorio-Carrasquillo, Zulay Rodriguez-Velez, Julissa Pinero, Yohama Gonzalez-Milan filed by Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Diaz-Rivera, Idza)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Document in Excess Pages filed by Idza Diaz-Rivera on behalf of Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia Responses due by 9/14/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Diaz-Rivera, Idza)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Idza Diaz-Rivera on behalf of Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia Responses due by 9/14/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Diaz-Rivera, Idza)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez: Status Conference held via VTC on 8/19/2021. Present: For plaintiffs, attorneys Arturo Bauermeister, Ilya Shapiro and Jose Davila. For defendant, attorney Joel Torres. Counsel for the parties were present via VTC and members of the press had access through teleconference. See Minute Entry attached. By August 26, 2021, plaintiffs shall disclose the information identified inparagraph 2 of Docket No. 18. By August 30, 2021, plaintiffs shall disclose the information identified in paragraph 3 of Docket No. 18. Defendant's filing of Rule 12(b)(6) motion and opposition to motion for preliminary injunction due August 31, 2021. (Court Reporter Cindy Brown.) Hearing set for 3:00 PM. Hearing started at 3:08 PM. Hearing ended at 3:52 PM. (vso)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re: #16 "Motion for Preliminary Injunction." Status Conference set for 8/19/2021 at 3:00 p.m. in VTC Bridge PAD before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Additional instructions with respect to the VTC will be notified to record counsel. First Joint Informative Motion due by 8/26/2021. Second Joint Informative Motion due by 8/30/2021. See attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Joint Motion Format)(LMR)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Granting #15 "Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/18/2021. (LMR)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/31/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Charts, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed PI Order)(Bauermeister-Fernandez, Arturo)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/31/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauermeister-Fernandez, Arturo)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting #12 "Request for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead on Account of Plaintiff's Filing of an Amended Complaint." Defendant shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead not later than August 31, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/17/2021. (ebb)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting #10 "Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice." The Clerk shall deposit the admission fee to the account of non appropriated funds of this court. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/17/2021. (LMR)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 31, 2021 to File Answer or otherwise plead re: #11 Amended Complaint, filed by Leila G. Ginorio-Carrasquillo, Zulay Rodriguez-Velez, Julissa Pinero, Yohama Gonzalez-Milan filed by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 8/31/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Zulay Rodriguez-Velez, Julissa Pinero, Leila G. Ginorio-Carrasquillo, Yohama Gonzalez-Milan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit OE-2021-058 Eng., #2 Exhibit CNE No. 2-221 Eng., #3 Exhibit Press Release 08-5-2021 Eng., #4 Exhibit DOJ OE-221-058 Eng.)(Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Motion to allow Shapiro Ilya to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7412246) filed by Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/30/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauermeister-Fernandez, Arturo)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #5 Motion to appear pro hac vice, 7 Order on Motion to Appear PHV. ***FILED IN ERROR - PHV applicant signed using electronic signature. Application to Appear as a PHV must be hand singed by applicant.*** (mcm)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Noting #8 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/13/2021. (ebb)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Torres-Ortiz on behalf of All Defendants (Torres-Ortiz, Joel)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ***FILED IN ERROR.*** ORDER:Granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice." The Clerk shall deposit the admission fee to the account of non appropriated funds of this court. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/13/2021. (LMR) Modified on 8/16/2021 (mcm).
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon All Defendants. (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ***FILED IN ERROR - PHV applicant signed using electronic signature.*** Motion to allow Ilya Shapiro to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7412246) filed by Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauermeister-Fernandez, Arturo) Modified on 8/16/2021 (mcm).
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: See attached. Plaintiffs shall serve process upon defendant not later than August 26, 2021. Defendant, in turn, shall answer the Complaint or otherwise plead not later than fourteen (14) days after service of process. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/12/2021.(LMR)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7410504.), filed by Zulay Rodriguez Velez, Julissa Pinero, Leila G Ginorio, Yohama Gonzalez Milan. Service due by 11/9/2021, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Category Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(Davila-Acevedo, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez Velez et al v. Pierluisi-Urrutia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zulay Rodriguez Velez
Represented By: Jose R. Davila-Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yohama Gonzalez Milan
Represented By: Jose R. Davila-Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leila G Ginorio
Represented By: Jose R. Davila-Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julissa Pinero
Represented By: Jose R. Davila-Acevedo
Represented By: Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro
Represented By: Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zulay Rodriguez-Velez
Represented By: Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro
Represented By: Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios
Represented By: Jose R. Davila-Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yohama Gonzalez-Milan
Represented By: Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro
Represented By: Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios
Represented By: Jose R. Davila-Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leila G. Ginorio-Carrasquillo
Represented By: Arturo V. Bauermeister-Fernandez
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro
Represented By: Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios
Represented By: Jose R. Davila-Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Joel Torres-Ortiz
Represented By: Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez
Represented By: Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asociacion de Alcaldes de Puerto Rico
Represented By: Jorge Martinez-Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Liberty Justice Center
Represented By: Jose A. Bague-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?