USA v. $10,400.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $10,400.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Case Number: 3:2021cv01367
Filed: August 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1341
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Publication by USA (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Muniz-Lorenzi, Manuel)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Warrant Issued to arrest/release property as to $10,400.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY. (Attachments: #1 Warrant of Arrest in Rem) (ad)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/18/2021. (MET)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem and Seizure filed by Manuel A. Muniz-Lorenzi on behalf of USA Responses due by 8/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Muniz-Lorenzi, Manuel)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $10,400.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY, filed by USA. Service due by 11/10/2021, (Attachments: #1 Unsworn Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet)(Muniz-Lorenzi, Manuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $10,400.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Manuel A. Muniz-Lorenzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $10,400.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?