Coco Rico LLC v. Universal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Coco Rico LLC
Defendant: Universal Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv01390
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance as additional counsel by Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jenks-Carballeira, Eduardo)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Motion for Leave to Appear, Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Appearance is NOTED. The request for an extension of time is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 9/23/2021. (ab)
September 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Edna M. Tejeda-Oyola on behalf of Universal Insurance Company (Tejeda-Oyola, Edna)
September 23, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear , MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/25/2021 to File Answer to the Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint, filed by Coco Rico LLC filed by Luis R. Ramos-Cartagena on behalf of Universal Insurance Company Responses due by 10/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Ramos-Cartagena, Luis)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Coco Rico LLC. (Category Sheet and Cover). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Amended Document) (Rivera-Aspinall, Julian)
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Civil Cover Sheet(JS44)and Category Sheet are incomplete. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 8/24/2021. (arg)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7422097.), filed by Coco Rico LLC. Service due by 11/18/2021, (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit)(Rivera-Aspinall, Julian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coco Rico LLC v. Universal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coco Rico LLC
Represented By: Julian R. Rivera-Aspinall
Represented By: Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Insurance Company
Represented By: Luis R. Ramos-Cartagena
Represented By: Edna M. Tejeda-Oyola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?