DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. v. Ortiz-Morales et al
Plaintiff: DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.
Defendant: ORTIZ MORALES ANGEL, GONZALEZ RIVERA SUSANA, Angel Rafael Ortiz-Morales, Susana Gonzalez-Rivera and Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-Gonzalez
Case Number: 3:2021cv01407
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Filing Exhibit filed by Agustin Fortuno-Fas on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. Responses due by 10/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fortuno-Fas, Agustin) Modified title on 9/28/2021 (idg).
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Service by Publication as to All Parties filed by Agustin Fortuno-Fas on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. Responses due by 10/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fortuno-Fas, Agustin)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-Gonzalez, Susana Gonzalez-Rivera, Angel Rafael Ortiz-Morales (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Exhibits Category Sheet filed by Agustin Fortuno-Fas on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. Responses due by 9/15/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet)(Fortuno-Fas, Agustin) Modified title on 9/2/2021 (idg).
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 8/31/2021. (arg)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Parties ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7431547.), filed by DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.. Service due by 11/29/2021, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Fortuno-Fas, Agustin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. v. Ortiz-Morales et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Agustin Fortuno-Fas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTIZ MORALES ANGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GONZALEZ RIVERA SUSANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Rafael Ortiz-Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susana Gonzalez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?