Rosario-Rosado v. USA
Petitioner: Evelio Rosario-Rosado
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2021cv01431
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Referring Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: This case having been previously assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi, recently appointed to the First Circuit Court of Appeals, it has been reassigned within the Case Assignment System to the docket of Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. Signed by Clerk on 11/02/2021. (gr)
October 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Franco Lorenzo Perez-Redondo on behalf of Evelio Rosario-Rosado (Perez-Redondo, Franco)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. The FPD's Office is appointed to represent petitioner Rosario, be it by further filing any necessary pleading related to his 2255 motion, or by filing a motion for Amendment 782 or compassionate relief accordingly. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/15/2021.(sc)
October 14, 2021 Filing 3 Supplemental Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support re: #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 13-124 (GAG)) filed by Evelio Rosario-Rosado, pro se. Responses due by 10/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (idg)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Denying #1 Motion to Vacate. Denied without prejudice. Petitioner does not elaborate as to why relief is warranted. He may supplement the grounds adduced in his motion within 30 days. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/14/2021. (MET)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 COPY of MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed in (Criminal Number 13-124 (GAG)) by Evelio Rosario-Rosado, Pro Se. Responses due by 9/21/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (mg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2021: #2 Transmittal Memo (NPV)) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosario-Rosado v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Evelio Rosario-Rosado
Represented By: Eric Vos
Represented By: Franco Lorenzo Perez-Redondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?