Rodriguez-Aponte v. Escobar-Pabon et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Rodriguez-Aponte
Defendant: Ana Escobar-Pabon and Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Case Number: 3:2021cv01436
Filed: September 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia L Carreno-Coll
Referring Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK. This case having been previously assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi, recently appointed to the First Circuit Court of Appeals, it has been reassigned within the Case Assignment System to the docket of Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll. Signed by Clerk on 11/02/2021. (gr)
October 18, 2021 Filing 10 Mail sent to Benjamin Rodriguez-Aponte was returned as undeliverable. No additional address available. (mg)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Noted #8 Motion in Compliance; Granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time until November 18, 2021 to file Certified Statement of Institution Account. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/06/2021. (BMC)
October 6, 2021 Filing 8 Motion In Compliance , MOTION for Extension of Time until November 18, 2021 to file Certified Statement of Institution Account filed by Hector Sueiro-Alvarez on behalf of Benjamin Rodriguez-Aponte Responses due by 10/20/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sueiro-Alvarez, Hector)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting #6 Motion to Restrict Document. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 09/24/2021. (mb)
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Restrict Document Affidavit in Support of Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, ECF No. 1-1 filed by Hector Sueiro-Alvarez on behalf of Benjamin Rodriguez-Aponte Responses due by 10/8/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sueiro-Alvarez, Hector)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Hector Sueiro-Alvarez on behalf of Benjamin Rodriguez-Aponte (Sueiro-Alvarez, Hector)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The FPD's Office is appointed. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/21/2021. (sc)
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING: The Prisoner did not attach a statement certified by the appropriate institutional officer, showing all receipts, expenditures, and balances during the last six months in his/her institutional account. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 10/5/2021. (ad)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Ana Escobar-Pabon, filed by Benjamin Rodriguez-Aponte, Pro Se. Service due by 12/14/2021, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(ad)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Benjamin Rodriguez-Aponte, Pro Se. Responses due by 9/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez-Aponte v. Escobar-Pabon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Rodriguez-Aponte
Represented By: Hector Sueiro-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Escobar-Pabon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?