Mas Muniz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Orlando E Mas Muniz
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2021cv01451
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK. This case having been previously assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi, recently appointed to the First Circuit Court of Appeals, it has been reassigned within the Case Assignment System to the docket of Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. Signed by Clerk on 11/03/2021. (gr)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff shall inform on or before September 24, 2021, whether he/she provides consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, as has the Commissioner. This will expedite resolution of the administrative appeal. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/20/2021. (MES)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney General & U.S. Attorneys Office (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT for Review of Disability Decision against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0104-7458160.), filed by Orlando E Mas Muniz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons Attorney Gen, #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 Summons Social Security)(Aviles-Aponte, Gabriel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mas Muniz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando E Mas Muniz
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?