Securities and Exchange Commission v. Back to Green Mining, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Back to Green Mining, LLC, Jose Jimenez and Manuel Portalatin
Case Number: 3:2021cv01455
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of time to Retain Legal Representation filed by Jose Jimenez-Cruz, Pro Se, as to Back to Green Mining, LLC. Responses due by 12/1/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mg)
November 3, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK. This case having been previously assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi, recently appointed to the First Circuit Court of Appeals, it has been reassigned within the Case Assignment System to the docket of Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. Signed by Clerk on 11/03/2021. (gr)
October 19, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Back to Green Mining, LLC waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Kisslinger, Paul)
October 18, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Jose Jimenez waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Kisslinger, Paul)
October 4, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission upon Jose Jimenez served on 9/28/2021, answer due 10/19/2021. (Kisslinger, Paul)
October 4, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission upon Back to Green Mining, LLC served on 9/28/2021, answer due 10/19/2021. (Kisslinger, Paul)
September 28, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Back to Green Mining, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/23/2021. (CRH)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Noted #2 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/23/2021. (CRH)
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Category Sheet - L.R. 3(a) re #1 Complaint filed by Securities and Exchange Commission (Kisslinger, Paul)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 9/23/2021. (arg)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos J. Andreu-Collazo on behalf of Manuel Portalatin (Andreu-Collazo, Carlos)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Javier Micheo-Marcial on behalf of Manuel Portalatin (Micheo-Marcial, Javier)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by Paul W. Kisslinger on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission Responses due by 10/5/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Defendant Manuel Portalatin, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Final Judgment as to Defendant Manuel Portalatin)(Kisslinger, Paul)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Back to Green Mining, LLC, Jose Jimenez, Manuel Portalatin, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Service due by 12/20/2021, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kisslinger, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Back to Green Mining, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Paul W. Kisslinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Back to Green Mining, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Portalatin
Represented By: Carlos J. Andreu-Collazo
Represented By: Javier Micheo-Marcial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?