Lopez v. United Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ruth Lopez
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01466
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Appearance is NOTED. Extension of time is GRANTED until November 29, 2021 to answer the Complaint. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/27/2021. (brc)
October 27, 2021 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint, filed by Ruth Lopez filed by Tomas A. Roman-Santos on behalf of United Airlines, Inc. Responses due by 11/10/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Roman-Santos, Tomas)
October 15, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ruth Lopez upon United Airlines, Inc. served on 10/7/2021, answer due 10/28/2021. (Bellver-Espinosa, Alejandro)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United Airlines, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Airlines, Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7468224.), filed by Ruth Lopez. Service due by 12/27/2021, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summon United Airlines, Inc)(Bellver-Espinosa, Alejandro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. United Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Lopez
Represented By: Alejandro Bellver-Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Tomas A. Roman-Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?