Otero-Otero v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Otero-Otero
Defendant: United States of America and U.S. Attorney's Office, District of Puerto Rico
Case Number: 3:2021cv01474
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER noted #5 Motion In Compliance; granting #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Clerk of the Court shall appoint pro-bono counsel to represent plaintiff. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 11/8/2021. (mrr)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Sandra Otero-Otero, pro se. Responses due by 11/15/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(rim)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 Motion In Compliance as to 3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Sandra Otero-Otero, pro se. Responses due by 11/15/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 3 ) (rim)
October 18, 2021 Filing 4 Summons issued as to U.S. Attorney's Office District of Puerto Rico & United States of America through the USMS, with copy of the order, complaint and USM-285. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 USM-285) (vdm)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. By October 21, 2021, Plaintiff shall file a motion indicating whether she wishes that the Court appoint pro-bono counsel to represent her at no cost or whether she will continue to represent herself. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 10/12/2021. (mrr)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sandra Otero-Otero, pro se. Service due by 12/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint Case no. 13-1793, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Summons)(rim)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Sandra Otero-Otero, pro se. Responses due by 10/13/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (rim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Otero-Otero v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Otero-Otero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney's Office, District of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?