Carlson et al v. Homeowners Association of Villas de Monte y Mar et al
Plaintiff: Meghan Carlson, Hannah Carlson, Mary Baker and Lee Baker
Defendant: Maria Julia Romero Rosado, Homeowners Association of Villas de Monte y Mar, MARIJULIA ROMERO ROSADO, Jose A Rodriguez Gonzalez, Conjugal Partnership comprised of Maria Julia Romero Rosado and Jose A. Rodriguez Gonzalez, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Group Inc., ABC Insurance Companies, JOHN DOE, JAMES ROE, Maria Julia Romero-Rosado, Marijulia Romero-Rosado, Jose A. Rodriguez-Gonzalez, Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Romero and La Casa del Covaleciente Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01475
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lee Baker, Hannah Carlson, Meghan Carlson, Mary Baker. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Indiano-Vicic, David)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Granting #19 "Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead." The appearing party shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by December 14, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/23/2021. (ebb)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Noting #18 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/23/2021. (ebb)
November 23, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 14, 2021 to File Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint, filed by Lee Baker, Mary Baker, Meghan Carlson, Hannah Carlson filed by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Homeowners Association of Villas de Monte y Mar, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company Responses due by 12/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando)
November 23, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Granting #16 "Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(B)(6) at DN 15." Response due by December 9, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/16/2021. (ebb)
November 15, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for extension of time until 12/09/2021 to oppose co-defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by David C. Indiano-Vicic on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Indiano-Vicic, David)
November 3, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Juan M. Cancio-Biaggi on behalf of Maria Julia Romero-Rosado Responses due by 11/17/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cancio-Biaggi, Juan)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting #12 "Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead." The appearing party shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by November 24, 2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/26/2021. (ebb)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Noting #11 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/26/2021. (ebb)
October 26, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise plead re: #1 Complaint, filed by Lee Baker, Mary Baker, Meghan Carlson, Hannah Carlson filed by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Homeowners Association of Villas de Monte y Mar Responses due by 11/9/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando) Modified on 10/26/2021 to replace capital letters (mcm).
October 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Homeowners Association of Villas de Monte y Mar (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Noting and Granting #9 "Notice of Appearance and Request for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead." The appearing party shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 11/8/2021. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/8/2021. (ebb)
October 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance and MOTION for Extension of Time by Juan M. Cancio-Biaggi on behalf of Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Romero, Jose A. Rodriguez-Gonzalez, Maria Julia Romero-Rosado. (Cancio-Biaggi, Juan) Modified on 10/8/2021 to add Motion for Extension of Time and filers (mcm).
October 7, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Romero served on 10/5/2021, answer due 10/26/2021; Homeowners Association of Villas de Monte y Mar served on 10/5/2021, answer due 10/26/2021; Jose A. Rodriguez-Gonzalez served on 10/5/2021, answer due 10/26/2021; Maria Julia Romero-Rosado served on 10/5/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. (Indiano-Vicic, David)
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Liberty Mutual Insurance Company served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (Indiano-Vicic, David)
October 6, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Liberty Mutual Insurance Group Inc. served on 10/4/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Indiano-Vicic, David)
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Romero, Homeowners Association of Villas de Monte y Mar, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Group Inc., Jose A. Rodriguez-Gonzalez, Maria Julia Romero-Rosado (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Williams-English on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Williams-English, Jeffrey)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanesa Vicens on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vicens, Vanesa)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7472725.), filed by Lee Baker, Hannah Carlson, Meghan Carlson, Mary Baker. Service due by 12/28/2021, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Indiano-Vicic, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlson et al v. Homeowners Association of Villas de Monte y Mar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Julia Romero Rosado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeowners Association of Villas de Monte y Mar
Represented By: Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIJULIA ROMERO ROSADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose A Rodriguez Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership comprised of Maria Julia Romero Rosado and Jose A. Rodriguez Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES ROE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Julia Romero-Rosado
Represented By: Juan M. Cancio-Biaggi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marijulia Romero-Rosado
Represented By: Juan M. Cancio-Biaggi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose A. Rodriguez-Gonzalez
Represented By: Juan M. Cancio-Biaggi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Rodriguez-Romero
Represented By: Juan M. Cancio-Biaggi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Casa del Covaleciente Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meghan Carlson
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Carlson
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Baker
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Baker
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?