Mawad-Melendez et al v. Molinos de Puerto Rico, LLC
Plaintiff: Manuel R. Mawad-Melendez, Rosario Josefina Budet-Gueits and Conjugal Partnership Mawad-Budet
Defendant: Molinos de Puerto Rico, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01477
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia L Carreno-Coll
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Luis M. Ferrer-Medina on behalf of Defendant Molinos de Puerto Rico, LLC.(Ferrer-Medina, Luis)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint or otherwise plead. Answer deadline due by 11/24/2021. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 10/19/2021. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
October 19, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 24, 2021 to File Answer to the Complaint filed by Luis M. Ferrer-Medina on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 11/2/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ferrer-Medina, Luis)
October 5, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Molinos de Puerto Rico, LLC served on 10/4/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Bague-Soto, Jose)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 10/01/2021. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Counsel for Plaintiffs filed by Myriam E. Matos-Bermudez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/14/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Matos-Bermudez, Myriam)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Molinos de Puerto Rico, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll (arg)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Molinos de Puerto Rico, LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7472939.), filed by Manuel R. Mawad-Melendez, Conjugal Partnership Mawad-Budet, Rosario Josefina Budet-Gueits. Service due by 12/28/2021, (Attachments: #1 Summons Molinos de Puerto Rico, LLC, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet)(Bague-Soto, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mawad-Melendez et al v. Molinos de Puerto Rico, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel R. Mawad-Melendez
Represented By: Jose A. Bague-Soto
Represented By: Myriam E. Matos-Bermudez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosario Josefina Budet-Gueits
Represented By: Jose A. Bague-Soto
Represented By: Myriam E. Matos-Bermudez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Mawad-Budet
Represented By: Jose A. Bague-Soto
Represented By: Myriam E. Matos-Bermudez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molinos de Puerto Rico, LLC
Represented By: Luis M. Ferrer-Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?