Erazo-Santana v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Erazo-Santana
Defendant: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Department of Justice of Puerto Rico
Case Number: 3:2021cv01479
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 18 Mail sent to Ileana C. Cardona-Fernandez was returned as undeliverable re #12 Notice of Appointment of Counsel. (ab)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: GRANTED. Counsel Ileana C. Cardona-Fernandez is withdrawn from the case. The Clerk will appoint another counsel for plaintiff Erazo Santana pursuant to Local Rule 83L. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/04/2021. (brc)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #13 Informative Motion: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/04/2021. (brc)
November 4, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Ileana C. Cardona-Fernandez filed by Ileana C. Cardona-Fernandez on behalf of Carlos Erazo-Santana Responses due by 11/18/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cardona-Fernandez, Ileana)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #6 Motion In Compliance filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana: NOTED. The Order filed at docket no. 9 is vacated. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/3/2021.(AA) Modified on 11/3/2021 to add docket text (ab).
November 3, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL re 11 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. Attorney Ileana C. Cardona-Fernandez Appointed for Carlos Erazo-Santana. Signed by Clerk on 11/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice in the Spanish language)(by mail: Atty. Ileana Cardona, Carlos Erazo-Santana)(ab)
November 2, 2021 Filing 13 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana, Pro Se. Responses due by 11/16/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(ab)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #8 Motion to Appoint Counsel: GRANTED. The Clerk will appoint counsel for plaintiff Erazo-Santana pursuant to Local Rule 83L. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/02/2021. (brc)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/02/2021. (brc)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ***VACATED AS PER DOCKET 14 ORDER***ORDER re #6 Motion in Compliance: NOTED. This document will be considered as plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/02/2021. (brc) Modified on 11/3/2021 (ab).
October 28, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana, Pro Se. Responses due by 11/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Envelope)(ab)
October 28, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana, Pro Se. Responses due by 11/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 *Restricted* Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement, #3 Envelope)(ab)
October 28, 2021 Filing 6 Motion In Compliance filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana, Pro Se. Responses due by 11/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(ab)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel: DENIED without prejudice, pending a correct filing of the complaint. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/01/2021. (brc)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana, Pro Se. (ab)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING: Pro se pleading is not in the form prescribed by U.S. District Court for such action, or in a format substantially conforming thereto. L.Civ.R. 3(c). Plaintiff did not pay the corresponding filing fee which is $402.00 for Civil Rights Complaints under 28 U.S.C. 2254, nor filed a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Plaintiffs request to proceed without prepayment of fees does not comply with the requirements of 28 U.S.C. 1915 and L.Civ. Rs. 3.1 (a), (b)(2) and (c)(4). Plaintiff did not submit Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff did not submit an Affidavit in Support of Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff did not submit the Civil Cover nor the Category Sheet. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 10/21/2021. (ad)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 ***RESTRICTED*** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Carlos Erazo-Santana, Pro Se. (ad)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Department of Justice of Puerto Rico, filed by Carlos Erazo-Santana, Pro Se. Service due by 12/29/2021, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erazo-Santana v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Erazo-Santana
Represented By: Ileana C. Cardona-Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?