Lowe v. FirstBank Puerto Rico et al
Plaintiff: Justin Anthony Lowe
Defendant: FirstBank Puerto Rico, Dona Fela, LLC, John Doe, Robert Doe, Mary Doe, Mark Doe, Joe Doe and Clark Doe
Case Number: 3:2021cv01617
Filed: December 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Roberto L. Prats-Palerm on behalf of Defendant FirstBank Puerto Rico.(Prats-Palerm, Roberto)
February 9, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Luis M. Ortega-Garcia on behalf of Defendant Dona Fela, LLC.(Ortega-Garcia, Luis) Modified on 2/10/2022 to link docket 1(gav).
February 9, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear and Join Legal Representation filed by Luis M. Ortega-Garcia on behalf of Dona Fela, LLC Responses due by 2/23/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ortega-Garcia, Luis) Modified on 2/10/2022 to remove italics (gav).
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear and Extension of Time. Answer is now due 2/16/2022. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/3/2022. (ERC)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time until February 11, 2021 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint. Answer now due by 2/11/2022. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 2/3/2022. (ERC)
January 17, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Roberto L. Prats-Palerm on behalf of FirstBank Puerto Rico Responses due by 1/31/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Prats-Palerm, Roberto)
January 11, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 11, 2021 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Justin Anthony Lowe filed by Roberto E. Ruiz-Comas on behalf of Dona Fela, LLC Responses due by 1/25/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Ruiz-Comas, Roberto)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dona Fela, LLC, FirstBank Puerto Rico (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
December 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clark Doe, Joe Doe, John Doe, Mark Doe, Mary Doe, Robert Doe, Dona Fela, LLC, FirstBank Puerto Rico ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-7573876.), filed by Justin Anthony Lowe. Service due by 3/18/2022, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Summons)(James-Hernandez, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowe v. FirstBank Puerto Rico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Anthony Lowe
Represented By: Glenn Carl James-Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FirstBank Puerto Rico
Represented By: Roberto L. Prats-Palerm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dona Fela, LLC
Represented By: Luis M. Ortega-Garcia
Represented By: Roberto E. Ruiz-Comas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?