WorldNet Telecommunications, LLC v. Puerto Rico Telephone Company Inc.
Respondent: WorldNet Telecommunications, LLC and Puerto Rico Telephone Company Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021mc00358
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia L Carreno-Coll
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9 U.S.C. ยง 9
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award filed by Puerto Rico Telephone Company Inc. Re: #1 MOTION requesting Order filed by WorldNet Telecommunications, LLC filed by Puerto Rico Telephone Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Procedural Order No 1, #2 Exhibit Email Communications, #3 Exhibit Procedural Order No 4, #4 Exhibit Email Communication, #5 Exhibit Email Communication, #6 Exhibit Procedural Order no 5, #7 Exhibit ICDR Rules Effective June 1 2014)(Aldarondo-Lopez, Eliezer)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Restrict; noted #4 Motion submitting; granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline due by 9/20/2021.) Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 8/26/2021. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time until September 20, 2021 to File Answer / Responsive Pleading re: #1 MOTION requesting Order filed by WorldNet Telecommunications, LLC filed by Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez on behalf of Puerto Rico Telephone Company Inc. Responses due by 8/24/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Aldarondo-Lopez, Eliezer)
August 3, 2021 Filing Fee Received $ 49.00, receipt number PRX100078007 (arg)
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra on behalf of WorldNet Telecommunications, LLC. (rim)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION Submitting Final Award re: #1 MOTION requesting Order filed by WorldNet Telecommunications, LLC filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra, Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach on behalf of WorldNet Telecommunications, LLC. Responses due by 8/13/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #1 ) (rim)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra, Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach on behalf of WorldNet Telecommunications, LLC Responses due by 8/13/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (rim)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #1 PETITION for Confirmation of Arbitration Award filed by WorldNet Telecommunications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (rim)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Confirmation of Arbitration Award against Puerto Rico Telephone Company Inc. filed by Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra, Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach on behalf of WorldNet Telecommunications, LLC. Responses due by 8/13/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(rim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WorldNet Telecommunications, LLC v. Puerto Rico Telephone Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WorldNet Telecommunications, LLC
Represented By: Miguel J. Rodriguez-Marxuach
Represented By: Maria Celeste Colberg-Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Puerto Rico Telephone Company Inc.
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?