Northwestern Selecta, Inc. v. Gonzalez-Beiro et al
Plaintiff: Northwestern Selecta, Inc.
Defendant: Ramon Gonzalez Beiro, Alex Muiz Lasalle, Ramon Gonzalez-Beiro and Alex Muniz-Lasalle
Case Number: 3:2022cv01092
Filed: February 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION Submitting English Translations re: 26 Order on Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents, #24 Response in Opposition, filed by Alex Muniz-Lasalle, Ramon Gonzalez-Beiro, #25 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Alex Muniz-Lasalle, Ramon Gonzalez-Beiro filed by Edward W. Hill-Tollinche on behalf of Ramon Gonzalez-Beiro, Alex Muniz-Lasalle Responses due by 5/5/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 26 , #24 , #25 ) (Hill-Tollinche, Edward)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Certified English translations due by 4/22/2022 . Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 4/13/2022. (mrr)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Edward W. Hill-Tollinche on behalf of Ramon Gonzalez-Beiro, Alex Muniz-Lasalle Responses due by 4/22/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Hill-Tollinche, Edward)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Ramon Gonzalez-Beiro, Alex Muniz-Lasalle Re: #23 Brief, filed by Northwestern Selecta, Inc. filed by Ramon Gonzalez-Beiro, Alex Muniz-Lasalle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Administrative Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer to Administrative Complaint, #3 Exhibit Notice of Initial Scheduling Hearing, #4 Exhibit Agreed Discovery Schedule)(Hill-Tollinche, Edward)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM In Support of Request for Injunctive Relief by Northwestern Selecta, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - 1, #2 Exhibit -2, #3 Exhibit - 3, #4 Exhibit - 4, #5 Exhibit - 5, #6 Exhibit - 6, #7 Exhibit - 7, #8 Exhibit - 8, #9 Exhibit - 9, #10 Exhibit - 10, #11 Exhibit - 11 (Proposed Order)) (Mendez-Gomez, Nestor) Modified docket text title on 3/28/2022 (rim).
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER noted #20 Informative motion. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 3/25/2022. (mrr)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Edward W. Hill-Tollinche on behalf of Defendants Ramon Gonzalez-Beiro, Alex Muniz-Lasalle.(Hill-Tollinche, Edward)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding late filing of answer to complaint filed by Edward W. Hill-Tollinche on behalf of Ramon Gonzalez-Beiro, Alex Muniz-Lasalle Responses due by 4/7/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Hill-Tollinche, Edward)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Idza Diaz-Rivera withdrawn from the case. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 3/21/2022. (mrr)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez withdrawn from the case. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 3/21/2022.(mrr)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Idza Diaz-Rivera filed by Idza Diaz-Rivera on behalf of Ramon Gonzalez-Beiro, Alex Muniz-Lasalle Responses due by 4/1/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Diaz-Rivera, Idza)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez filed by Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 4/1/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cintron-Rodriguez, Jose)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach: Status Conference held on 3/11/2022 via VTC. Present: Atty. Nestor Mendez, Atty. Edward Hill, Atty. Idza Diaz and Atty. Jose Cintron. The parties informed the Court of the status of the case. The Court granted the #14 Joint Motion. The parties shall abide by the proposed schedule. (Court Reporter Robin Dispenzieri.) (gyr)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Joint Motion In Compliance as to #6 Order, filed by Nestor Mendez-Gomez on behalf of All Parties. Responses due by 3/24/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulations)(Related document(s) #6 ) (Mendez-Gomez, Nestor) Modified to add filer on 3/11/2022 (rim).
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 3/10/2022. (mrr)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward W. Hill-Tollinche on behalf of Ramon Gonzalez-Beiro, Alex Muniz-Lasalle (Hill-Tollinche, Edward)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for extension of time until 5:00 pm today filed by Nestor Mendez-Gomez on behalf of Northwestern Selecta, Inc. Responses due by 3/24/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mendez-Gomez, Nestor)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Idza Diaz-Rivera on behalf of Ramon Gonzalez-Beiro, Alex Muniz-Lasalle (Diaz-Rivera, Idza)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez on behalf of All Defendants (Cintron-Rodriguez, Jose)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER noted #7 Motion submitting Proof of Service of Order. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 3/3/2022. (mrr)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION Submitting Proof of Service of Order re: #6 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, filed by Nestor Mendez-Gomez on behalf of Northwestern Selecta, Inc. Responses due by 3/14/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #6 ) (Mendez-Gomez, Nestor)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/11/2022 10:00 AM in VTC Bridge RAM before Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. Additional instructions with respect to the VTC will be notified to counsel of record. Joint Motions due by 3/10/2022. Plaintiff shall serve this order upon defendants no later than March 3, 2022, and provide proof of service by March 4, 2022. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 2/25/2022. (mrr)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Northwestern Selecta, Inc. upon Ramon Gonzalez-Beiro served on 2/25/2022, answer due 3/18/2022; Alex Muniz-Lasalle served on 2/25/2022, answer due 3/18/2022. (Mendez-Gomez, Nestor)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ramon Gonzalez-Beiro and Alex Muniz-Lasalle. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (rim)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. (rim)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement byNorthwestern Selecta, Inc.. (Mendez-Gomez, Nestor)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) against Ramon Gonzalez Beiro, Alex Muiz Lasalle ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-7651035.), filed by Northwestern Selecta, Inc.. Service due by 5/25/2022, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 1A to Complaint, #6 Exhibit 1B to Complaint, #7 Exhibit 2A to Complaint, #8 Exhibit 2B to Complaint, #9 Exhibit 3A to Complaint, #10 Exhibit 3B to Complaint)(Mendez-Gomez, Nestor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwestern Selecta, Inc. v. Gonzalez-Beiro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwestern Selecta, Inc.
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Gonzalez Beiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Muiz Lasalle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Gonzalez-Beiro
Represented By: Edward W. Hill-Tollinche
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Muniz-Lasalle
Represented By: Edward W. Hill-Tollinche
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?