DJL Mortgage Capital, Inc. v. Negron-Martinez et al
Plaintiff: DJL Mortgage Capital, Inc. and DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.
Defendant: Risela Negron-Martinez, United States of America, Risela Negrn-Quiones A/K/A Risela Negrn-Quionez, Risela Negron-Quinones and Risela Negron-Quinonez
Case Number: 3:2022cv01105
Filed: March 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia L Carreno-Coll
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION Submitting Defendant's Military Status Pursuant To The Servicemember's Relief Act filed by Agustin Fortuno-Fas on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. Responses due by 4/8/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit SCRA Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Search Performed)(Fortuno-Fas, Agustin)
March 4, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Risela Negron-Quinones, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
March 4, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll (arg)
March 3, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States of America, Risela Negron-Quiones A/K/A Risela Negron-Quinonez, filed by DJL Mortgage Capital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Note & Allonge, #2 Exhibit Deed No. 8, #3 Exhibit Deed No. 104, #4 Summons Summons to USA, #5 Summons Summons to Risela Negron)(Fortuno-Fas, Agustin) Modified on 3/4/2022 to edit typo(ecc).
March 3, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION Submitting Civil Cover Sheet, Category Sheet, and Regarding Amended Complaint filed by Agustin Fortuno-Fas on behalf of DJL Mortgage Capital, Inc. Responses due by 3/17/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Fortuno-Fas, Agustin)
March 3, 2022 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 3/4/2022. (arg)
March 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-7658826.), filed by DJL Mortgage Capital, Inc.. Service due by 5/31/2022, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Note and Allonge, #2 Exhibit Deed No. 8, #3 Exhibit Deed No. 104)(Fortuno-Fas, Agustin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DJL Mortgage Capital, Inc. v. Negron-Martinez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DJL Mortgage Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Agustin Fortuno-Fas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Agustin Fortuno-Fas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Risela Negron-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Risela Negrn-Quiones A/K/A Risela Negrn-Quionez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Risela Negron-Quinones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Risela Negron-Quinonez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?