Lime Residential, LTD. v. Ortiz-Santana et al
Plaintiff: Lime Residential, LTD.
Defendant: Abner Ortiz-Santana, Carmen Santiago-Rivera and Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-Santiago
Case Number: 3:2022cv01116
Filed: March 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia L Carreno-Coll
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Stay. This case is stayed until 6/13/2022 while Plaintiff reviews the loss mitigation application submitted by Defendants. The Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by 6/13/2022 stating whether they have reached an agreement or if the stay should be extended in order to continue negotiations. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 04/12/2022. (MRB)
April 12, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Due to Loss Mitigation Process filed by Agustin Fortuno-Fas on behalf of Lime Residential, LTD. Responses due by 4/26/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fortuno-Fas, Agustin)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER noted #3 Motion submitting Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet in compliance with the Notice of Defective Filing filed by Lime Residential, LTD., noted #6 MOTION Submitting Defendants' Military Status Search filed by Lime Residential, LTD., granting #7 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 11, 2022 to File Answer to the complaint filed by Abner Ortiz-Santana, Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-Santiago, Carmen Santiago-Rivera. Answer deadline due by 5/11/2022. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 4/11/2022. (Carreno-Coll, Silvia)
April 11, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 11, 2022 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Lime Residential, LTD. filed by Carlos A. Piovanetti-Dohnert on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 4/25/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Piovanetti-Dohnert, Carlos)
March 17, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION Submitting Defendants' Military Status Search filed by Agustin Fortuno-Fas on behalf of Lime Residential, LTD. Responses due by 3/31/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit SCRA Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Search Performed)(Fortuno-Fas, Agustin)
March 8, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-Santiago, Abner Ortiz-Santana, Carmen Santiago-Rivera (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
March 8, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll (arg)
March 7, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION Submitting Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet in complaince with re: #2 Notice of Defective Filing filed by Agustin Fortuno-Fas on behalf of Lime Residential, LTD. Responses due by 3/21/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Related document(s) #2 ) (Fortuno-Fas, Agustin)
March 7, 2022 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Civil Cover Sheet(JS44)and Category Sheet are incomplete. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 3/8/2022. (arg)
March 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-7662720.), filed by Lime Residential, LTD.. Service due by 6/2/2022, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Note & Allonge, #2 Exhibit Deed No. 28, #3 Exhibit Deed No. 316, #4 Summons Summons to Abner, #5 Summons Summons to Carmen, #6 Summons Summons to Abner as a member of the Conjugal Legal Partnership, #7 Summons Summons to Carmen as a member of the Conjugal Legal Partnership, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Category Sheet)(Fortuno-Fas, Agustin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lime Residential, LTD. v. Ortiz-Santana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lime Residential, LTD.
Represented By: Agustin Fortuno-Fas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abner Ortiz-Santana
Represented By: Carlos A. Piovanetti-Dohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Santiago-Rivera
Represented By: Carlos A. Piovanetti-Dohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-Santiago
Represented By: Carlos A. Piovanetti-Dohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?