Ramos et al v. Willert Home Products
Plaintiff: Julio Ramos, Margarita Bras, Conjugal Partnership, Ramos Bras, Conjugal Partnership Ramos-Bras and J. Ramos & Assoc.
Defendant: Willert Home Products
Case Number: 3:2022cv01247
Filed: May 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Darren Keith Sharp on behalf of Willert Home Products (Sharp, Darren)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER holding in abeyance #14 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall respond to the motion to dismiss by August 9, 2022. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 7/27/2022. (mrr)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Darren K. Sharp re: 13 Order on Motion to Appear PHV : The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (rim)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim For Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by Rossell Barrios-Amy on behalf of Willert Home Products Responses due by 8/8/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (PRSG Contract), #2 Exhibit B (Letter), #3 Exhibit C (printout of P.R. Corporate Registry))(Barrios-Amy, Rossell)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear PHV. Attorney Darren K. Sharp admitted PHV. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 7/22/2022. (mrr)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement byWillert Home Products. (Barrios-Amy, Rossell)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #11 MOTION for Disclosure of Corporate Defendant. ***FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT EVENT*** Counsel to re-file using the correct event. (rim)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ***FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT EVENT*** MOTION for Disclosure of Corporate Defendant filed by Rossell Barrios-Amy on behalf of Willert Home Products Responses due by 8/4/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Barrios-Amy, Rossell) Modified on 7/22/2022 (rim).
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Motion to allow Darren Sharp to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-7843352) filed by Rossell Barrios-Amy on behalf of Willert Home Products Responses due by 8/4/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Barrios-Amy, Rossell)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Willert Home Products Inc. shall plead or otherwise defend by July 26, 2022. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 6/28/2022. (mrr)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Rossell Barrios-Amy on behalf of Willert Home Products Responses due by 7/7/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Barrios-Amy, Rossell)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Willert Home Products (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach (arg)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #1 Complaint filed by Julio Ramos, Conjugal Partnership, Ramos Bras, Margarita Bras, #4 Notice of Defective Filing (Penagaricano, Gabriel)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Category Sheet is incomplete. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 6/1/2022. (arg)
May 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons filed by Gabriel A. Penagaricano on behalf of Julio Ramos, Conjugal Partnership, Ramos Bras, Margarita Bras (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Penagaricano, Gabriel) Modified docket text and event on 6/1/2022 (rim).
May 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet filed by Gabriel A. Penagaricano on behalf of Margarita Bras, Conjugal Partnership, Ramos Bras, Julio Ramos (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Penagaricano, Gabriel) Modified docket text title and event on 6/1/2022 (rim).
May 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Willert Home Products ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-7774659.), filed by Julio Ramos, Conjugal Partnership, Ramos Bras, Margarita Bras. Service due by 8/29/2022,(Penagaricano, Gabriel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos et al v. Willert Home Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Ramos
Represented By: Gabriel A. Penagaricano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Bras
Represented By: Gabriel A. Penagaricano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership, Ramos Bras
Represented By: Gabriel A. Penagaricano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Ramos-Bras
Represented By: Gabriel A. Penagaricano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Ramos & Assoc.
Represented By: Gabriel A. Penagaricano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willert Home Products
Represented By: Darren Keith Sharp
Represented By: Rossell Barrios-Amy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?