Panneflek v. Verastegui et al
Plaintiff: Ricardo Panneflek
Defendant: Renzo Verastegui, Renatta Verastegui, Delivery DRD Corp., New Life Broadcasting, Inc., Arso Radio Corporation, XYZ Corporation, John Doe, Miami All Network Marketing Inc. and Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2022cv01282
Filed: June 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) Re #20 Opinion and Order, #21 Judgment. (idg)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 JUDGMENT: The Court DENIES co-defendant Arso Radio Corporation's request at ECF No. #18 . Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2), the motion for voluntary dismissal of the case with prejudice at ECF No. #17 is GRANTED without the imposition of attorney's fees. All pending motions are thus MOOT. The case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/20/2023. (gyr)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 OPINION AND ORDER re #17 MOTION to dismiss with Prejudice as to All Defendants filed by Ricardo Panneflek. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2), the motion for voluntary dismissal of the case with prejudice at ECF No. 17 is GRANTED without the imposition of attorney's fees. All pending motions are thus MOOT. Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 1/20/2023.(wm)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Response to Motion for Voluntary Dismissal filed by Ricardo Panneflek Re: #18 Response to Motion filed by Arso Radio Corporation filed by Ricardo Panneflek. (Belendez-Ferrero, Laura) Modified relationship on 11/30/2022 (idg).
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion For Dismissal (DK. 17) filed by Arso Radio Corporation Re: #17 MOTION to dismiss with Prejudice as to All Defendants filed by Ricardo Panneflek filed by Arso Radio Corporation. (Rodriguez-Lopez, Luis)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to dismiss with Prejudice as to All Defendants filed by Laura Belendez-Ferrero on behalf of Ricardo Panneflek Responses due by 11/30/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Belendez-Ferrero, Laura)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Co Defendant Arso's ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Luis M. Rodriguez-Lopez on behalf of Defendant Arso Radio Corporation.(Rodriguez-Lopez, Luis) Modified to add relationship on 10/31/2022 (idg).
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 28, 2022 to File Answer filed by Luis M. Rodriguez-Lopez on behalf of Arso Radio Corporation Responses due by 10/11/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Lopez, Luis)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION Requesting Service by Publication filed by Ricardo Panneflek. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Summons, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Belendez-Ferrero, Laura) Modified event and title on 9/15/2022 (idg).
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricardo Panneflek upon Arso Radio Corporation served on 9/7/2022, answer due 9/28/2022; New Life Broadcasting, Inc. served on 9/7/2022, answer due 9/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Belendez-Ferrero, Laura)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Service by Publication as to Miami All Network Marketing Inc., Renatta Verastegui, Renzo Verastegui filed by Laura Belendez-Ferrero on behalf of Ricardo Panneflek Responses due by 9/26/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Statement under Penalty of Perjury from Process Server, #2 Exhibit 2-Summons for Service by Publication, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Service of Summons by Publication)(Belendez-Ferrero, Laura)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #10 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations. NOTED. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/29/2022. (ao) Modified italic text on 8/31/2022 (idg).
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations filed by Laura Belendez-Ferrero on behalf of Ricardo Panneflek Responses due by 8/23/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 13)(Belendez-Ferrero, Laura)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. The notice of appearance filed as "motion for leave to appear" at ECF No. 6 is NOTED. Plaintiff's motion requesting an order at ECF No. 8 is DENIED. Notably, plaintiff moves the Court to "enter the order to show cause as to why the preliminary injunction should not issue", however is yet to submit returned or executed summons in this action. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 65, cited by plaintiff in its proposed order at ECF No. 2-1, (stating that the Court "may issue a preliminary injunction only on notice to the adverse party.") Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 7/28/2022.(wm)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION requesting Order as to Hearing on Order to Show Cause filed by Laura Belendez-Ferrero on behalf of Ricardo Panneflek Responses due by 8/11/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Belendez-Ferrero, Laura)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification), filed by Ricardo Panneflek.(Belendez-Ferrero, Laura)
June 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear on Behalf of Plaintiff filed by Samuel F. Pamias-Portalatin on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/5/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appearance Form)(Pamias-Portalatin, Samuel)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Arso Radio Corporation, Delivery DRD Corp., Miami All Network Marketing Inc., New Life Broadcasting, Inc., Renatta Verastegui, Renzo Verastegui. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. (vdm)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Case Initiating Documents filed by Laura Belendez-Ferrero on behalf of Ricardo Panneflek Responses due by 6/30/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Belendez-Ferrero, Laura) Modified on 6/16/2022 to correct event title (mcm).
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Laura Belendez-Ferrero on behalf of Ricardo Panneflek Responses due by 6/30/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Belendez-Ferrero, Laura)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number BPRDC-7799303.), filed by Ricardo Panneflek. Service due by 9/14/2022, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Certificate of Registration, #2 Exhibit 2-Samples of Use Collagen 21, #3 Exhibit 3-Defendants Use of Infringing Product, #4 Exhibit 4-Office Action, #5 Exhibit 5-Response to Office Action, #6 Exhibit 6-Types of Collagen, #7 Exhibit 7-Arso Radio Group Letter, #8 Exhibit 8-Response Arso Radio Group, #9 Exhibit 9-Cease and Desist Letter REV and Miami All Network, #10 Exhibit 10-Response from REV and Miami All Network, #11 Exhibit 11-Google Search, #12 Exhibit 12-Cease and Desist NLB, #13 Exhibit 13-New Life Response, #14 Exhibit 14-DRD Cease and Desist)(Belendez-Ferrero, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Panneflek v. Verastegui et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Panneflek
Represented By: Laura Belendez-Ferrero
Represented By: Samuel F. Pamias-Portalatin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renzo Verastegui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renatta Verastegui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delivery DRD Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Life Broadcasting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arso Radio Corporation
Represented By: Luis M. Rodriguez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami All Network Marketing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?