Ramos-Ramos v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Petitioner: Pedro J. Ramos-Ramos
Respondent: Federal Bureau of Prisons, Michael Carvajal and Warden Serrano
Case Number: 3:2022cv01359
Filed: July 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2022 Filing Fee Received $ 5.00, receipt number 100623, re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Pedro J. Ramos-Ramos, pro se. (rim)
August 9, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 8/29/2022. (rim) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2022: #1 Cashier's Letter) (rim).
July 27, 2022 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Plaintiffs request to proceed without prepayment of fees does not comply with the requirements of 28 U.S.C. 1915 and L. Civ. Rs. 3.1 (a), (b)(2) and (c)(4). The Prisoner did not attach a statement certified by the appropriate institutional officer, showing all receipts, expenditures, and balances during the last six months in his/her institutional account. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 8/29/2022. (rim)
July 27, 2022 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANT: The Clerk's Office has received your Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. A new case has been opened and assigned to Judge William G. Young. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerk's Office concerning your case must include the case number: 3:22-cv-01359-WGY. All documents for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and dark enough for scanning. The Court enforces its rules and expects compliance with all directives; failure to comply with a court rule, federal law, or court directive may result in dismissal. The plaintiff must also keep the Court informed of any address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned undelivered, the case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (rim) Modified docket text on 7/29/2022 (rim).
July 26, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION requesting Order filed by Pedro J. Ramos-Ramos, Pro Se. Responses due by 8/9/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope).(mg)
July 26, 2022 Filing 1 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Pedro J. Ramos-Ramos, pro se. Service due by 10/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Envelope)(rim) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2022: #7 NPV PSLC Transmittal Memo) (rim).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos-Ramos v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pedro J. Ramos-Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?