Clemente Properties, Inc. et al v. Pierluisi et al
Plaintiff: Clemente Properties, Inc., 21 In Right, Inc., Roberto Clemente Jr., Luis Roberto Clemente and Roberto Enrique Clemente
Defendant: Pedro R. Pierluisi, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Eileen M. Vlez, Francisco Pars, Ray J. Quiones, Puerto Rico Convention District Authority, Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia, The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Eileen M. Velez-Vega, Francisco Pares-Alicea, Ray J. Quiones-Vazquez, John Doe, Conjugal Partnership Doe-Velez, Jane Doe and Conjugal Partnership Quinones-Doe
Case Number: 3:2022cv01373
Filed: August 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1127 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor J. Quinones-Martinez on behalf of Puerto Rico Convention District Authority (Quinones-Martinez, Victor)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FRCP 12b(6) filed by Gilberto J. Oliveras-Maldonado on behalf of Puerto Rico Convention District Authority Responses due by 10/12/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Oliveras-Maldonado, Gilberto)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez on behalf of Francisco Pares-Alicea, Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia, Ray J. Quiones-Vazquez, The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Eileen M. Velez-Vega Responses due by 10/12/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cintron-Rodriguez, Jose) Modified title on 9/29/2022 (idg).
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Puerto Rico Convention District Authority served on 9/9/2022, answer due 9/30/2022. (Padilla-Rodriguez, Tanaira)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Ray J. Quiones-Vazquez served on 9/9/2022, answer due 9/30/2022. (Padilla-Rodriguez, Tanaira)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Francisco Pares-Alicea served on 9/7/2022, answer due 9/28/2022. (Padilla-Rodriguez, Tanaira)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Eileen M. Velez-Vega served on 9/9/2022, answer due 9/30/2022. (Padilla-Rodriguez, Tanaira)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico served on 9/12/2022, answer due 10/3/2022. (Padilla-Rodriguez, Tanaira)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia served on 9/12/2022, answer due 10/3/2022. (Padilla-Rodriguez, Tanaira)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Francisco Pares-Alicea, Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia, Puerto Rico Convention District Authority, Ray J. Quinones-Vazquez, The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Eileen M. Velez-Vega (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification), filed by Roberto Clemente Jr., 21 In Right, Inc., Luis Roberto Clemente, Clemente Properties, Inc., Roberto Enrique Clemente.(Padilla-Rodriguez, Tanaira)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits regarding summons filed by Tanaira Padilla-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 8/23/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Padilla-Rodriguez, Tanaira) Modified title on 8/9/2022 (idg).
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits regarding initiating documents filed by Tanaira Padilla-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/19/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Padilla-Rodriguez, Tanaira) Modified title on 8/9/2022 (idg).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-7861333.), filed by Roberto Clemente Jr., 21 In Right, Inc., Luis Roberto Clemente, Clemente Properties, Inc., Roberto Enrique Clemente. Service due by 11/3/2022, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Padilla-Rodriguez, Tanaira)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clemente Properties, Inc. et al v. Pierluisi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clemente Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Tanaira Padilla-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 21 In Right, Inc.
Represented By: Tanaira Padilla-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Clemente Jr.
Represented By: Tanaira Padilla-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Roberto Clemente
Represented By: Tanaira Padilla-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Enrique Clemente
Represented By: Tanaira Padilla-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro R. Pierluisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eileen M. Vlez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Pars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray J. Quiones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Convention District Authority
Represented By: Gilberto J. Oliveras-Maldonado
Represented By: Victor J. Quinones-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro R. Pierluisi-Urrutia
Represented By: Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eileen M. Velez-Vega
Represented By: Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Pares-Alicea
Represented By: Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray J. Quiones-Vazquez
Represented By: Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Doe-Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Quinones-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?