De Jesus-Velazquez v. Social Security
Plaintiff: Wanda De Jesus-Velazquez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2022cv01453
Filed: September 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Camille L Velez-Rive
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole J. Boudreau on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Boudreau, Nicole)
October 17, 2022 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security through the US Marshals with copy of Order, copy of Complaint and USM 285 (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 USM 285) (ad)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: granting Docket no. #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Summons to be issued. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on October 17, 2022. (ASE)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: noting Docket No. #11 Motion In Compliance. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on October 17, 2022. (ASE)
October 16, 2022 Filing 11 Motion In Compliance Court Order filed by David Luis Torres-Velez on behalf of Wanda De Jesus-Velazquez Responses due by 10/31/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sword Statement, #2 Exhibit ALJ Decision)(Torres-Velez, David)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 MOTION to extend Social Security deadlines to file Comply Court Order. Compliance due by 10/30/2022. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 9/29/2022. (ari)
September 28, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to extend Social Security deadlines to file Comply Court Order filed byDavid Luis Torres-Velez on behalf of Wanda De Jesus-Velazquez. Responses due by 10/12/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torres-Velez, David)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: holding in abeyance Docket No. #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff seeks to file this case in forma pauperis, yet the financial affidavit accompanying her petition indicates she owns real estate valued at $170,000. In light of this fact, Plaintiff shall explain to the Court the reason for her in forma pauperis petition, on or before September 30, 2022. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on September 21, 2022. (ASE)
September 21, 2022 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (Docket No. 6), this case has been randomly assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive for all further proceedings, including the entry of judgment. All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 22-1453 (CVR). Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 09/21/2022. (ft)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Commissioner of Social Security has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in all cases involving judicial review of a final order denying disability benefits under the Social Security Act. Because plaintiff has also consented (Docket No. 3), the case is referred to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/21/2022. (FAR)
September 20, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
September 16, 2022 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE of Social Security Number in compliance with Local Civil Rule 9 by David Luis Torres-Velez on behalf of Wanda De Jesus-Velazquez.(Torres-Velez, David)
September 16, 2022 Filing 3 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Wanda De Jesus-Velazquez. (Torres-Velez, David)
September 16, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Wanda De Jesus-Velazquez. Service due by 12/15/2022, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Athorization, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Torres-Velez, David)
September 16, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David Luis Torres-Velez on behalf of Wanda De Jesus-Velazquez Responses due by 9/30/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pauperis Petition, #2 Exhibit Financial Affidavit)(Torres-Velez, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Jesus-Velazquez v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda De Jesus-Velazquez
Represented By: David Luis Torres-Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Nicole J. Boudreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?