United States of America v. OSNET Wireless Corp
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: OSNET WIRELESS CORP
Case Number: 3:2022cv01472
Filed: September 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed Question: Fed Communications Act of 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2022 Filing 7 JUDGMENT is entered DISMISSING this action WITH PREJUDICE in its entirety. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 10/24/2022. (mrr)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granted #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Judgment of dismissal shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 10/24/2022.(mrr)
October 21, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United States of America (Fortuno-Fas, Juan)
October 18, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America upon OSNET Wireless Corp served on 10/10/2022, answer due 10/28/2022. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) Modified to correct date served on 10/18/2022 (rim).
October 3, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to OSNET WIRELESS CORP (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
October 3, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach (arg)
September 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OSNET WIRELESS CORP, filed by United States of America. Service due by 12/29/2022, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NOA, #2 Exhibit FO, #3 Exhibit Certificate, #4 Summons OSNET, #5 Category Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fortuno-Fas, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. OSNET Wireless Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Juan C. Fortuno-Fas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSNET WIRELESS CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?