Montijo-Maysonet v. USA
Petitioner: Byron Montijo-Maysonet
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2022cv01474
Filed: October 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 Motion to Restrict: GRANTED. Signed by Senior Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/28/2022. (brc)
November 23, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Ginette L. Milanes on behalf of USA Responses due by 12/7/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Milanes, Ginette)
November 23, 2022 Filing 2 ***SELECTED PARTIES***RESPONSE to Motion filed by USA, Byron Montijo-Maysonet Re: #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 16-242) filed by Byron Montijo-Maysonet filed by USA, Byron Montijo-Maysonet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unsworn Statement, #2 Exhibit Hospital Notes, #3 Exhibit English Translation, #4 Exhibit Police Report, #5 Exhibit English Translation, #6 Exhibit Interview and Service Form, #7 Exhibit English Translation, #8 Exhibit Referral Form, #9 Exhibit English Translation)(Milanes, Ginette)
October 4, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 16-242) filed by Jessica Earl on behalf of Byron Montijo-Maysonet Responses due by 10/18/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Earl, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montijo-Maysonet v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Byron Montijo-Maysonet
Represented By: Jessica Earl
Represented By: Eric Vos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza
Represented By: Ginette L. Milanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?