Hernandez-Cruz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Betty Hernandez-Cruz
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2022cv01478
Filed: October 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Marshal D Morgan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granted #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
October 7, 2022 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach (Docket No. 7), this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan to conduct all further proceedings, including entry of judgment. All further pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil No. 22-1478(MDM). Judge Arias-Marxuach is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 10/07/2022. (gr)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge: The Commissioner of Social Security has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in all cases involving judicial review of a final order denying disability benefits under the Social Security Act. Given plaintiff's consent (Docket No. #5 ), the case is referred to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 10/7/2022. (mrr)
October 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach (arg)
October 6, 2022 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Betty Hernandez-Cruz. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
October 6, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Betty Hernandez-Cruz (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
October 6, 2022 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Betty Hernandez-Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
October 6, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez on behalf of Betty Hernandez-Cruz Responses due by 10/20/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)
October 6, 2022 Filing 1 **SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Betty Hernandez-Cruz. (Cruz-Sanchez, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez-Cruz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Hernandez-Cruz
Represented By: Pedro G. Cruz-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?