Garcia-Sierra v. USA
Petitioner: Adolfo Leon Garcia-Sierra
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2022cv01489
Filed: October 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: GRANTED. United States' response due December 28, 2022. Signed by Senior Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/28/2022. (brc)
November 28, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/28/2022 to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 14-cr-166-FAB) filed by Adolfo Leon Garcia-Sierra, #7 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Adolfo Leon Garcia-Sierra filed by Ricardo A. Imbert on behalf of USA Responses due by 12/12/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 , #7 ) (Imbert, Ricardo)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255). The government will respond to petitioner's corrected motion no later than November 28, 2022. Signed by Senior Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/16/2022. (brc)
November 14, 2022 Filing 7 Corrected MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), (Correction: signed 2255 petition for relief), filed by Adolfo Leon Garcia-Sierra, pro se. Responses due by 11/28/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rim)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255): GRANTED. Response to motion is extended until November 28, 2022. Signed by Senior Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/28/2022. (brc)
October 27, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/28/2022 to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 14-cr-166-FAB) filed by Adolfo Leon Garcia-Sierra filed by Ricardo A. Imbert on behalf of USA Responses due by 11/10/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Imbert, Ricardo)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 14-cr-166-FAB) as to Adolfo Leon Garcia-Sierra. The government will respond to this motion no later than October 28, 2022. Signed by Senior Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/17/2022. (brc)
October 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANT: The Clerk's Office has received your MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255. A new case has been opened and assigned to Senior Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerk's Office concerning your case must include the case number 22-cv-01489-FAB. All documents for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and dark enough for scanning. The Court enforces its rules and expects compliance with all directives; failure to comply with a court rule, federal law, or court directive may result in dismissal. The plaintiff must also keep the Court informed of any address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned undelivered, the case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (ab)
October 14, 2022 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING re #1 Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255): Petitioner did not sign his 2255 petition for relief. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 11/14/2022. (ab)
October 11, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 14-cr-166-FAB) filed by Adolfo Leon Garcia-Sierra, Pro Se. Responses due by 10/25/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Envelope)(ab) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/14/2022: #3 NPV PSLCM) (ab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia-Sierra v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adolfo Leon Garcia-Sierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza
Represented By: Ricardo A. Imbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?