Robles-Perez v. Escobar-Pabon
Petitioner: Jose Luis Robles-Perez
Respondent: Ana Escobar-Pabon
Case Number: 3:2022cv01503
Filed: October 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER: FPD Eric A. Vos for Jose Luis Robles-Perez appointed. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 12/5/2022. (mrr)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Federal Public Defender is appointed to represent petitioner. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 12/5/2022. (mrr)
November 22, 2022 Filing 11 ***SELECTED PARTIES***Corrected AFFIDAVIT in support of Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis re 9 Order, #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Jose Luis Robles-Perez, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rim)
November 22, 2022 Filing 10 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** Corrected AFFIDAVIT in support of Motion Requesting Appointment of Counsel, re 9 Order, #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, by Jose Luis Robles-Perez, pro se. (rim) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2022: #1 Envelope) (rim).
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Petitioner did not comply with the Order at Docket No. 8 requiring him to file a duly completed financial affidavit. The Court grants an extension until November 30, 2022 to do so. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 11/9/2022. (mrr)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER holding in abeyance #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, and #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Petitioner submitted a blank financial affidavit and thus has not placed the Court in a position to rule on these requests. Petitioner shall submit a duly filled out financial affidavit by November 4, 2022. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 10/21/2022. (mrr)
October 19, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANT: The Clerk's Office has received your Complaint. A new case has been opened and assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerk's Office concerning your case must include the case number: 3:22-cv-01503-RAM. All documents for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and dark enough for scanning. The Court enforces its rules and expects compliance with all directives; failure to comply with a court rule, federal law, or court directive may result in dismissal. The plaintiff must also keep the Court informed of any address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned undelivered, the case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (rim)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the Order of Recusal entered by Senior Judge Francisco A. Besosa (Docket No. 4), this case has been randomly reassigned within the Case Assignment System to the docket of Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. Signed by Clerk on 10/19/2022. (ft)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 Complaint. I recuse myself from presiding over this case. The Clerk will assign this case to another district judge. Signed by Senior Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/18/2022. (brc)
October 18, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Ana Escobar-Pabon, filed by Jose Luis Robles-Perez, Pro Se. Service due by 1/17/2023, (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ad)
October 18, 2022 Filing 2 ***RESTRICTED*** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jose Luis Robles-Perez, Pro Se. (ad)
October 18, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jose Luis Robles-Perez, Pro Se. Responses due by 11/1/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robles-Perez v. Escobar-Pabon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Luis Robles-Perez
Represented By: Eric Vos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ana Escobar-Pabon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?