Navarro v. USA
Petitioner: Joeing Navarro
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2022cv01513
Filed: October 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2022 Filing 5 JUDGMENT is entered DISMISSING this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 12/6/2022. (mrr)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Motion to Vacate. Defendant failed to comply with the notice of defective filing at Docket #2 which warned him that non-compliance could result in dismissal. Accordingly, this petition is dismissed without prejudice. Judgment of dismissal shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 12/6/2022. (mrr)
October 27, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANT: The Clerk's Office has received your Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255). A new case has been opened and assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerk's Office concerning your case must include the case number: 3:22-cv-01513-RAM. All documents for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and dark enough for scanning. The Court enforces its rules and expects compliance with all directives; failure to comply with a court rule, federal law, or court directive may result in dismissal. The plaintiff must also keep the Court informed of any address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned undelivered, the case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (rim)
October 27, 2022 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Petitioner did not answer all the questions in the 2255 form. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 11/28/2022. (rim)
October 25, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 3:14-cr-00505-RAM-15) filed by Joeing Navarro, pro se. Responses due by 11/8/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rim) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/27/2022: #2 NPV PSLC Memorandum) (rim).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navarro v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joeing Navarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?