Dumanian v. FirstBank Puerto Rico
Plaintiff: MD Gregory Dumanian
Defendant: FirstBank Puerto Rico
Case Number: 3:2022cv01543
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Camille L Velez-Rive
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The parties shall file a Joint Proposed Scheduling Memorandum including Rule 26 disclosures; each party's factual and legal contentions; each party's fact and expert witnesses with a short summary of their testimonies; a discovery timetable with suggested deadlines; and whether each party consents to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including the entry of judgment. The Court will then issue a Case Management Order approving and/or modifying the proposed discovery timetable, rendering those deadlines final and binding upon all parties. Compliance due by 2/13/2023. Signed by District Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 1/12/2023.(ari)
January 9, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of Defendant FirstBank Puerto Rico.(Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: granting Docket No. #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by Gregory Dumanian filed by FirstBank Puerto Rico. Answer deadline due by 1/9/2023. Signed by District Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on December 15, 2022. (ASE)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: NOTING Docket No. #6 Motion submitting translations filed by Gregory Dumanian. Signed by District Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on December 15, 2022. (ASE)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been transferred to the docket of newly appointed U.S. District Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive. Signed by Chief Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 12/14/2022. (ft)
December 8, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 9, 2023 to File Answer to the Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Gregory Dumanian filed by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of FirstBank Puerto Rico Responses due by 12/22/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando)
December 8, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina on behalf of FirstBank Puerto Rico (Valderrabano-Marina, Fernando)
December 6, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory Dumanian upon FirstBank Puerto Rico served on 11/18/2022, answer due 12/9/2022. (Cobian-Roig, Eduardo)
December 2, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations of Exhibits 5, 6, 7 and 8 of the Complaint re: 5 Order on Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Eduardo J. Cobian-Roig on behalf of Gregory Dumanian Responses due by 12/16/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 5 of the Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 6 of the Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 7 of the Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 8 of the Complaint)(Related document(s) 5 ) (Cobian-Roig, Eduardo)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Certified translations due by 12/5/2022. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 12/2/2022. (wm)
November 16, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to FirstBank Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
November 16, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (vdm)
November 16, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Eduardo J. Cobian-Roig on behalf of Gregory Dumanian Responses due by 11/30/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cobian-Roig, Eduardo)
November 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against FirstBank Puerto Rico ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-7990703.), filed by Gregory Dumanian. Service due by 2/13/2023, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #14 Summons FirstBank Puerto Rico Summons)(Cobian-Roig, Eduardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dumanian v. FirstBank Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MD Gregory Dumanian
Represented By: Eduardo J. Cobian-Roig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FirstBank Puerto Rico
Represented By: Fernando J. Valderrabano-Marina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?