Julbe-Rosa v. USA
Petitioner: Ramon A. Julbe-Rosa
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2022cv01645
Filed: December 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2023 Filing 4 Supplemental Motion re: #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 3:19-cr-00458-ADC-1) filed by Ramon A. Julbe-Rosa, pro se. Responses due by 1/31/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (idg)
January 11, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa D. Bonano-Rodriguez on behalf of USA (Bonano-Rodriguez, Vanessa)
December 27, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANT: The Clerk's Office has received your Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct a Sentence Pursuant to Title 28 U.S.C.2255. A new case has been opened and assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerk's Office concerning your case must include the case number: 3:22-cv-01645-ADC. All documents for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and dark enough for scanning. The Court enforces its rules and expects compliance with all directives; failure to comply with a court rule, federal law, or court directive may result in dismissal. The plaintiff must also keep the Court informed of any address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned undelivered, the case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (rim)
December 22, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 3:19-cr-00458-ADC-1) filed by Ramon A. Julbe-Rosa, pro se. Responses due by 1/9/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(rim) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2022: #11 NPV PSLC Transmittal Memo) (rim).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Julbe-Rosa v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ramon A. Julbe-Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza
Represented By: Vanessa D. Bonano-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?