Kopel-Ballester v. Colon-Hernandez et al
Plaintiff: Daniel J. Kopel-Ballester
Defendant: MD Pedro J Colon-Hernandez, Conjugal Partnership Colon-Doe, MD Elizardo Matos-Cruz, Jane Roe, Jane Doe, Hospital General Menonita d/b/a Hospital Menonita de Cayey, Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company, John Doe, Lt. Richard Roe, XYZ Insurance Companies, XYZ Entities, XYZ Companies and Conjugal Partnerhip Matos-Roe
Case Number: 3:2023cv01139
Filed: March 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead; #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead; #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead. Answers or Responsive Pleadings due by 6/7/2023. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 5/11/2023. (ABO)
May 9, 2023 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance and MOTION for extension of time until June 7, 2023 to Answer the Complaint or otherwise Plead filed by Nuyen Marrero-Bonilla on behalf of Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company Responses due by 5/23/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Marrero-Bonilla, Nuyen) Modified to correct event type and docket text title on 5/9/2023 (rim).
May 9, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for extension of time until 06/08/2023 to ANSWER COMPLAINT filed by Benjamin Morales-Del-Valle on behalf of Elizardo Matos-Cruz, Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company Responses due by 5/23/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Morales-Del-Valle, Benjamin) Modified to correct event type on 5/9/2023 (rim).
May 8, 2023 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance and MOTION for extension of time until June 7, 2023 to to Answer the Complaint or otherwise plead filed by Nuyen Marrero-Bonilla on behalf of Pedro J Colon-Hernandez Responses due by 5/22/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Marrero-Bonilla, Nuyen) Modified on 5/9/2023 to edit docket title text. (mg).
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead. Answer or pleading due by 6/1/2023. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 5/3/2023. (ABO)
May 2, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 1, 2023 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Daniel J. Kopel-Ballester filed by Gilberto C. Ramos-Martinez on behalf of Hospital General Menonita d/b/a Hospital Menonita de Cayey Responses due by 5/16/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Ramos-Martinez, Gilberto)
April 26, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Pedro J. Colon-Hernandez on 4/13/2023. Answer due 5/4/2023 (Santos-Irizarry, Alicia) Modified on 4/27/2023 to add service information (mcm).
April 26, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #4 Summons Returned Executed. ***FILED IN ERROR Incorrect PDF.*** (gav)
April 25, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company served on 4/13/2023, answer due 5/4/2023. (Santos-Irizarry, Alicia)
April 25, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Hospital General Menonita d/b/a Hospital Menonita de Cayey served on 4/12/2023, answer due 5/3/2023. (Santos-Irizarry, Alicia)
April 25, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Conjugal Partnerhip Matos-Roe served on 4/18/2023, answer due 5/9/2023. (Santos-Irizarry, Alicia)
April 25, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Elizardo Matos-Cruz served on 4/18/2023, answer due 5/9/2023. (Santos-Irizarry, Alicia)
April 25, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Conjugal Partnership Colon-Doe served on 4/13/2023, answer due 5/4/2023. (Santos-Irizarry, Alicia)
April 25, 2023 Filing 4 ***FILED IN ERROR Incorrect PDF.*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Pedro J Colon-Hernandez served on 4/13/2023, answer due 5/4/2023. (Santos-Irizarry, Alicia) Modified on 4/26/2023 (gav).
March 27, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Pedro J Colon-Hernandez, Conjugal Partnerhip Matos-Roe, Conjugal Partnership Colon-Doe, Hospital General Menonita d/b/a Hospital Menonita de Cayey, Elizardo Matos-Cruz, Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (arg)
March 27, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. (arg)
March 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-8149579.), filed by Daniel J. Kopel-Ballester. Service due by 6/22/2023, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Dr. Pedro J. Colon Hernandez, #4 Summons Conjugal Partnerhip Colon-Doe, #5 Summons Dr. Elizardo Matos Cruz, #6 Summons Conjugal Partnership Matos-Roe, #7 Summons Hospital General Menonita d/b/a Hospital Menonita de Cayey, #8 Summons Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company)(Santos-Irizarry, Alicia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kopel-Ballester v. Colon-Hernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel J. Kopel-Ballester
Represented By: Alicia Margarita Santos-Irizarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Pedro J Colon-Hernandez
Represented By: Nuyen Marrero-Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Colon-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Elizardo Matos-Cruz
Represented By: Benjamin Morales-Del-Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital General Menonita d/b/a Hospital Menonita de Cayey
Represented By: Gilberto C. Ramos-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company
Represented By: Benjamin Morales-Del-Valle
Represented By: Nuyen Marrero-Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Richard Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Entities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnerhip Matos-Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?