Ramos-Cruz v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, et al
Plaintiff: KRYSTAL M RAMOS CRUZ, Domingo Emmanuelli-Hermandez, Antonio Lopez Figueroa and Krystal M. Ramos-Cruz
Defendant: Domingo Emanuelli, Antonio Lopez, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Police Bureau
Case Number: 3:2023cv01449
Filed: August 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until November 11, 2023 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead. Granted as requested. Answer deadline due by 11/11/2023. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 10/27/2023. (wm)
October 27, 2023 Filing 14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until November 11, 2023 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 11/13/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cintron-Rodriguez, Jose)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 27, 2023 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Antonio Lopez, Puerto Rico Police Bureau, Domingo Emanuelli, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Answer deadline due by 10/27/2023. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 9/22/2023. (su)
September 20, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance, MOTION for Extension of Time until October 27, 2023 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Domingo Emanuelli, Antonio Lopez, Puerto Rico Police Bureau. Responses due by 10/4/2023. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cintron-Rodriguez, Jose) Modified title on 9/21/2023 (idg).
September 7, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Krystal M. Ramos-Cruz upon Commonwealth of Puerto Rico served on 9/6/2023, answer due 9/27/2023; Domingo Emanuelli served on 9/6/2023, answer due 9/27/2023; Antonio Lopez served on 9/6/2023, answer due 9/27/2023; Puerto Rico Police Bureau served on 9/6/2023, answer due 9/27/2023. (Prieto-Carballo, Jose)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: In view of the Order of Recusal by Senior Judge Francisco A. Besosa (Docket No. 9), this case has been randomly reassigned to the docket of Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. Signed by Clerk on 09/06/2023. (ft)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. I recuse myself from presiding over this case. The Clerk will assign this case to another district judge. Signed by Senior Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/06/2023. (brc)
September 6, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Antonio Lopez-Figueroa. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (arg)
September 6, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Senior Judge Francisco A. Besosa. (arg)
September 5, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Category Sheet (Prieto-Carballo, Jose)
September 1, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Prieto-Carballo, Jose)
September 1, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits in compliance with Clerk's Notice of Defective Filing, civil cover sheet filed by Jose M. Prieto-Carballo on behalf of Krystal M. Ramos-Cruz. (Prieto-Carballo, Jose) Modified docket text title and remove response deadline on 9/5/2023 (rim).
September 1, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose M. Prieto-Carballo on behalf of KRYSTAL M RAMOS CRUZ (Prieto-Carballo, Jose)
September 1, 2023 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. The filing fee has not been received. Also, Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) and Category Sheet were not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 9/5/2023. (vdm)
August 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Domingo Emmanuelli-Hermandez, Antonio Lopez Figueroa ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-8356159.), filed by KRYSTAL M RAMOS CRUZ. Service due by 11/29/2023, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PROTECTION ORDER, #2 Exhibit FIRE ARM RECEPTION CERTIFICATE)(Sandoval-Baez, Osvaldo) Modified to add receipt number on 9/5/2023 (rim).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos-Cruz v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRYSTAL M RAMOS CRUZ
Represented By: Osvaldo Sandoval-Baez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domingo Emmanuelli-Hermandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Lopez Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal M. Ramos-Cruz
Represented By: Osvaldo Sandoval-Baez
Represented By: Jose M. Prieto-Carballo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domingo Emanuelli
Represented By: Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Lopez
Represented By: Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Police Bureau
Represented By: Jose R. Cintron-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?