Erickson v. Emmanuelli et al
Plaintiff: Erica Marie Erickson
Defendant: Jose Rafael Ramos-Quinones, Maria Gonzalez, Jose Figueroa-Andujar, David Caban-Mendez, Solymar Crespo-Gonzalez, DVM Marilyn Arce, Teleonce, Andres Fernandez-Vera, Antonio Lopez-Figueroa, DVM Adriana Luna and Domingo Emmanuelli
Case Number: 3:2024cv01389
Filed: August 29, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Camille L Velez-Rive
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER finding as moot #13 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 10/25/2024. (CVR)
October 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Co-defendants Domingo Emanuelli-Hernndez, in his official capacity, and Antonio Lpez-Figueroa, in his official and personal capacities, are granted until December 7, 2024, to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 10/25/2024. (CVR)
October 25, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erica Marie Erickson upon Adriana Luna served on 10/18/2024, answer due 11/8/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons served on Dr. Adriana Luna) (Lopez-Ortiz, Bamily)
October 23, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 7, 2024 to File Answer or otherwise plead filed by Pablo Tufino-Soto on behalf of Domingo Emmanuelli, Antonio Lopez-Figueroa. Responses due by 11/6/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Tufino-Soto, Pablo)
October 23, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Entry (official capacities) as to Domingo Emmanuelli, Antonio Lopez-Figueroa filed by Bamily Lopez-Ortiz on behalf of Erica Marie Erickson. Responses due by 11/6/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez-Ortiz, Bamily)
October 22, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erica Marie Erickson upon Marilyn Arce served on 10/17/2024, answer due 11/7/2024; David Caban-Mendez served on 10/17/2024, answer due 11/7/2024; Domingo Emmanuelli served on 9/27/2024, answer due 10/18/2024; Andres Fernandez-Vera served on 10/21/2024, answer due 11/12/2024; Maria Gonzalez served on 10/21/2024, answer due 11/12/2024; Antonio Lopez-Figueroa served on 9/27/2024, answer due 10/18/2024; Teleonce served on 10/2/2024, answer due 10/23/2024. (Lopez-Ortiz, Bamily) Modified on 10/22/2024 to correct event and add date of service (mcm).
October 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Liberman Media Group LLC is granted until December 7, 2024 to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 10/21/2024. (CVR)
October 21, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Teleonce (Estrella, Alberto)
October 21, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 7, 2024 to File Answer Liberman Media Group LLC respectfully requests a forty-five (45) day extension of time, from October 23, 2024, until December 7, 2024, to answer or otherwise plead. filed by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of Teleonce. Responses due by 11/4/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
October 21, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of Teleonce (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
October 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Co-Defendant Antonio Lopez-Figueroa is granted until November 18, 2024 to allow the Department of Justice to complete review of his request for legal representation and to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 10/21/2024. (CVR)
October 18, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 18, 2024 to File Answer or otherwise plead filed by Pablo Tufino-Soto on behalf of Antonio Lopez-Figueroa. Responses due by 11/1/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Tufino-Soto, Pablo)
September 18, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Marilyn Arce, David Caban-Mendez, Solymar Crespo-Gonzalez, Domingo Emmanuelli, Andres Fernandez-Vera, Jose Figueroa-Andujar, Maria Gonzalez, Antonio Lopez-Figueroa, Adriana Luna, Jose Rafael Ramos-Quinones, Teleonce. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (ad)
September 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Summons. Summonses to be issued by the Clerk's Office. Signed by Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 09/18/2024. (CVR)
September 18, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants filed by Bamily Lopez-Ortiz on behalf of Erica Marie Erickson. Responses due by 10/2/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Emmanuelli in official capacity, #2 Summons Emmanuelli individual capacity, #3 Summons Lopez Figueroa in official capacity, #4 Summons Lopez Figueroa individual capacity, #5 Summons Fernandez Vera - Fiscal, #6 Summons Figueroa Andujar - Captain, #7 Summons Ramos Quiones - Agent, #8 Summons Caban Mendez - Sgt, #9 Summons Adriana Luna DVM, #10 Summons Marilyn Arce DVM, #11 Summons Soymar Crespo Gonzlez, #12 Summons Maria de los A Gonzalez, #13 Summons Teleonce)(Lopez-Ortiz, Bamily)
August 30, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive. (vdm)
August 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405 receipt number APRDC-8805506.), filed by Erica Marie Erickson. Service due by 11/27/2024, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lopez-Ortiz, Bamily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erickson v. Emmanuelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Marie Erickson
Represented By: Bamily Lopez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Rafael Ramos-Quinones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Figueroa-Andujar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Caban-Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solymar Crespo-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVM Marilyn Arce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teleonce
Represented By: Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso
Represented By: Alberto G. Estrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andres Fernandez-Vera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Lopez-Figueroa
Represented By: Pablo Tufino-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVM Adriana Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domingo Emmanuelli
Represented By: Pablo Tufino-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?