Zambrano-Villamar v. Adan
Plaintiff: Ramon Ivan Zambrano-Villamar and Angel L. Adan
Case Number: 3:2024cv01413
Filed: September 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying: #5 "Motion for Leave to File Spanish Language Documents." As per the Local Rules of the Court all pleadings shall be in English. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 10/16/2024. (ao)
October 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting: #6 "Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis." Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 10/16/2024. (ao)
October 11, 2024 Filing 7 ***RESTRICTED*** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Ramon Ivan Zambrano-Villamar, Pro Se. (arg)
October 11, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ramon Ivan Zambrano-Villamar, Pro Se. Responses due by 10/25/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Envelope)(arg)
October 11, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Ramon Ivan Zambrano-Villamar, Pro Se. Responses due by 10/25/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(arg)
September 13, 2024 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Plaintiff did not pay the corresponding filing fee which is $5.00 for Habeas Courpus Complaints under 28 U.S.C. 2241, nor filed a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff did not submit Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff did not submit an Affidavit in Support of Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The Prisoner did not attach a statement certified by the appropriate institutional officer, showing all receipts, expenditures, and balances during the last six months in his/her institutional account. (arg)
September 12, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANT: The Clerk's Office has received your Complaint. A new case has been opened and assigned to Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerk's Office concerning your case must include the case number 24-cv-1413(MAJ). All documents for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and dark enough for scanning. The Court enforces its rules and expects compliance with all directives; failure to comply with a court rule, federal law, or court directive may result in dismissal. The plaintiff must also keep the Court informed of any address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned undelivered, the case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (Copy of this notice, #4 Defective Filing and Pauperis Forms sent to Pro Se by mail.) (arg) Modified on 9/13/2024 (arg).
September 10, 2024 Filing 2 ***FILED IN ERROR Incorrect Deficiencies-New N.D.F. to be re-file*** CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Pro se pleading is not in the form prescribed by U.S. District Court for such action, or in a format substantially conforming thereto. L.Civ.R. 3(c). Plaintiff did not pay the corresponding filing fee which is $405.00 for Civil Rights Complaints under 42 U.S.C. 1983, nor filed a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The Prisoner did not attach a statement certified by the appropriate institutional officer, showing all receipts, expenditures, and balances during the last six months in his/her institutional account. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 10/9/2024. (ad) Modified on 9/12/2024. (arg)
September 10, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Angel L. Adan, filed by Ramon Ivan Zambrano-Villamar, Pro Se. Service due by 12/9/2024, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(ad) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2024: #3 PSLC Memo) (arg). Modified on 9/12/2024 to correct defendant name. (arg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zambrano-Villamar v. Adan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Ivan Zambrano-Villamar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel L. Adan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?