Garcia v. Adan
Petitioner: Manuel Garcia
Respondent: Warden Angel L. Adan
Case Number: 3:2024cv01419
Filed: September 11, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. The Clerk of the Court shall appoint pro-bono counsel. Status Report due by December 20, 2024; granting #10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 11/7/2024. (mrr)
October 31, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Manuel Garcia, pro se. Responses due by 11/14/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: ***SELECTED PARTIES*** #1 Financial Affidavit in support of motion, #2 Envelope)(rim)
October 31, 2024 Filing 9 ***RESTRICTED*** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Manuel Garcia, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rim)
October 31, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Manuel Garcia, pro se. Responses due by 11/14/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: ***SELECTED PARTIES*** #1 Financial Affidavit in support of motion, #2 Envelope)(rim) Modified docket text and Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2024 (rim).
October 28, 2024 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Pleading or document is not in the English language and plaintiff has not moved for permission to file pleading in the Spanish language. L.Civ.R. 5. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 11/25/2024. (Attachments: #1 Pleading) (rim) (Notice sent via regular mail to defendant.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2024: #2 Envelope) (rim).
October 25, 2024 Filing Fee Received $ 5.00, receipt number 115126. (rim)
October 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER noted #5 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 10/24/2024. (mrr)
October 16, 2024 Filing 5 INFORMATIVE MOTION regarding: Filing Fee filed by Manuel Garcia, pro se. Responses due by 10/31/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (idg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2024: #2 Envelope) (idg). Modified to correct docket event type, add response deadline and edit text title on 10/18/2024 (rim).
September 18, 2024 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Plaintiff did not pay the corresponding filing fee which is $5.00 for Habeas Corpus Complaints under 28 U.S.C., Sec. 2241, nor filed a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff's request to proceed without prepayment of fees does not comply with the requirements of 28 U.S.C. 1915 and L.Civ. Rs. 3.1 (a), (b)(2) and (c)(4). The Prisoner did not attach a statement certified by the appropriate institutional officer, showing all receipts, expenditures, and balances during the last six months in his/her institutional account.Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 10/17/2024. (rim) (Notice sent to pro se via mail.)
September 11, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANT: The Clerk's Office has received your Complaint. A new case has been opened and assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerk's Office concerning your case must include the case number: 3:24-cv-01419-RAM. All documents for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and dark enough for scanning. The Court enforces its rules and expects compliance with all directives; failure to comply with a court rule, federal law, or court directive may result in dismissal. The plaintiff must also keep the Court informed of any address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned undelivered, the case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (Copy of this notice sent to Pro Se by mail.) (rim)
September 11, 2024 Filing 2 ***FILED IN ERROR*** CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Pro se pleading is not in the form prescribed by U.S. District Court for such action, or in a format substantially conforming thereto. L.Civ.R. 3(c). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 10/10/2024. (ad) Modified on 9/18/2024 (rim).
September 11, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Angel Adan, filed by Manuel Garcia, Pro Se. Service due by 12/10/2024 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(ad) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2024: #4 Supplementary Document) (rim). Modified docket text title on 9/18/2024 (rim).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Adan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Manuel Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Angel L. Adan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?