Hernandez-Molina v. Estado Libre Asociado de Puerto Rico et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Hernandez-Molina
Defendant: Estado Libre Asociado de Puerto Rico and Department of Correction and Rehabilitation
Case Number: 3:2024cv01435
Filed: September 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gina R Mendez-Miro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 Notice of Defective Filing. On September 27, 2024, the Clerk's Office notified Plaintiff of their defective filing (Docket No. 2) and issued a Notice of Compliance Deadline for October 27, 2024 (Docket No. 3). Plaintiff did not file such notice before the deadline. Plaintiff shall on or before December 2, 2024, file a Notice of Compliance as requested by the Clerk's office at Docket No. 3. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case for lack of prosecution.Signed by Judge Gina R. Mendez-Miro on 10/30/2024.(GMN)
September 27, 2024 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 10/27/2024. Pleading or document is not in the English language and plaintiff has not moved for permission to file pleading in the Spanish language. L.Civ.R. 5. Pro se pleading is not in the form prescribed by U.S. District Court for such action, or in a format substantially conforming thereto. L.Civ.R. 3(c). Plaintiff did not pay the corresponding filing fee which is $402.00 for a 1983 prisoner civil rights case, nor filed a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Plaintiffs request to proceed without prepayment of fees does not comply with the requirements of 28 U.S.C. 1915 and L.Civ. Rs. 3.1 (a), (b)(2) and (c)(4). U.S.C. 1915 y R.L.Civ. 3.1(a), (b)(2) y (c)(4).). Plaintiff did not submit an Affidavit in Support of Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The Prisoner did not attach a statement certified by the appropriate institutional. (mg) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/27/2024) (mg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2024: #1 Declaration) (mg).
September 27, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANT: The Clerk's Office has received your Complaint. A new case has been opened and assigned to Judge Gina R. Mendez-Miro. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerk's Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and dark enough for scanning. The Court enforces its rules and expects compliance with all directives; failure to comply with a court rule, federal law, or court directive may result in dismissal. The plaintiff must also keep the Court informed of any address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned undelivered, the case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (Copy of this notice sent to Pro Se by mail.) (mg)
September 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Correction and Rehabilitation, Estado Libre Asociado de Puerto Rico, filed by Jonathan Hernandez-Molina, Pro Se. Service due by 12/18/2024, (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez-Molina v. Estado Libre Asociado de Puerto Rico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Hernandez-Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estado Libre Asociado de Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Correction and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?