R5 Partners, Inc. v. Renatus Advisors LLC et al
Plaintiff: R5 PARTNERS, INC.
Defendant: ERIC SWIDER, Renatus Advisors, LLC and Renatus, LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv01440
Filed: September 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Raul M Arias-Marxuach
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Renatus, LLC, Eric Swider. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (vdm)
October 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by R5 Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Penagaricano, Gabriel) Modified docket text title on 10/29/2024 (rim). Modified on 10/31/2024 to edit exhibit description. (mg).
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Renatus Advisors, LLC, Eric Swider, filed by R5 Partners, Inc..(Penagaricano, Gabriel) Modified docket text title on 10/29/2024 (rim).
September 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, Plaintiff is granted until September 27, 2024 to amend the Complaint's jurisdictional allegations to specifically aver the following matters which are essential to determining whether the court possesses diversity of citizenship subject matter jurisdiction over this case: (a) Plaintiff's principal place of business; (b) the identity and citizenship for jurisdictional purposes of co-defendant Renatus Advisors LLC's member(s); and (c) the citizenship of Eric Swider. Failure to comply with this order shall result in dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 9/20/2024. (mrr)
September 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to RENATUS ADVISORS LLC, ERIC SWIDER. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (vdm)
September 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. (vdm)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RENATUS ADVISORS LLC, ERIC SWIDER ( Filing fee $405 receipt number APRDC-8830664.), filed by R5 PARTNERS, INC.. Service due by 12/18/2024, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Penagaricano, Gabriel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R5 Partners, Inc. v. Renatus Advisors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC SWIDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renatus Advisors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renatus, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R5 PARTNERS, INC.
Represented By: Gabriel A. Penagaricano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?