Garcia-Hernandez v. Departamento de Correccion y Rehabilitacion et al
Petitioner: Angel A. Garcia-Hernandez
Respondent: Departamento de Justicia, Departamento de Correccion y Rehabilitacion and Junta de Libertad Bajo Palabra
Case Number: 3:2024cv01464
Filed: October 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Denying without prejudice #3 "Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit." Petitioner did not attach a statement certified by the appropriate penal/institutional officer, showing all receipts, expenditures, and balances of his institutional account during the last six months. See, Clerk's Notice of Defective Filing (Docket No. 2). Petitioner may refile the motion with the corresponding supporting documentation not later than December 2, 2024. Otherwise, he will have to pay the $5.00 filing fee for a prisoner habeas corpus. See, Docket No. 2. Failure to refile the motion or pay the filing fee by that date may result in dismissal of the petition. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/8/2024. (AEM)
November 1, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Angel A. Garcia-Hernandez, Pro Se. Responses due by 11/15/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (mcm)
October 7, 2024 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Pleading or document is not in the English language and plaintiff has not moved for permission to file pleading in the Spanish language (L.Civ.R. 5). Pro se pleading is not in the form prescribed by U.S. District Court for such action, or in a format substantially conforming thereto (L.Civ.R. 3(c)). Plaintiff did not pay the corresponding filing fee which is $5.00 for a prisoner habeas corpus, nor filed a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff did not submit Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff did not submit an Affidavit in Support of Motion to Proceed in FormaPauperis. The Prisoner did not attach a statement certified by the appropriate institutional. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 11/6/2024. Notification sent to Angel A. Garcia-Hernandez with copies of Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis' form and Habeas Corpus (2241) form. (mcm)
October 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in the Spanish language against Departamento de Correccion y Rehabilitacion, Departamento de Justicia, Junta de Libertad Bajo Palabra, filed by Angel A. Garcia-Hernandez, Pro Se. Service due by 1/2/2025. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(mcm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2024: #4 *NPV PSLC Transmittal Memo*) (mcm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia-Hernandez v. Departamento de Correccion y Rehabilitacion et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Angel A. Garcia-Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Departamento de Justicia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Departamento de Correccion y Rehabilitacion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Junta de Libertad Bajo Palabra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?