Ramon-Rodriguez v. USA
Petitioner: Luis Ramon-Rodriguez
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2024cv01470
Filed: October 8, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: GRANTED until December 26, 2024 to submit response to petitioner's motion. Signed by Senior Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/22/2024. (brc)
November 22, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 26, 2024 to File Response/Reply filed by Mariana E. Bauza on behalf of USA. Responses due by 12/6/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauza, Mariana)
October 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: GRANTED. Response to motion deadline is extended until November 25, 2024. Signed by Senior Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/22/2024. (brc)
October 22, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 25, 2024 to File Response/Reply filed by Mariana E. Bauza on behalf of USA. Responses due by 11/6/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauza, Mariana)
October 21, 2024 Filing 4 Supplemental Motion re: #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 3:22-cr-00266-FAB-2) filed by Luis Ramon-Rodriguez, Pro Se. Responses due by 11/4/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ab)
October 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255). The government will respond to this motion to vacate sentence no later than October 23, 2024. Signed by Senior Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/09/2024. (brc)
October 8, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANT: The Clerk's Office has received your MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255). A new case has been opened and assigned to Senior Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerk's Office concerning your case must include the case number 24-cv-01470-FAB. All documents for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and dark enough for scanning. The Court enforces its rules and expects compliance with all directives; failure to comply with a court rule, federal law, or court directive may result in dismissal. The plaintiff must also keep the Court informed of any address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned undelivered, the case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (Copy of this notice sent to Pro Se by mail.) (ab)
October 8, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 22-cr-00266-FAB-2) filed by Luis Ramon-Rodriguez, Pro Se. Responses due by 10/22/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramon-Rodriguez v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Luis Ramon-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?