Gracie's Ventures, Inc.
Debtor: Gracie's Ventures, Inc.
Us Trustee: Gary L. Donahue
Case Number: 1:2020bk11269
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Diane Finkle
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 53 BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE:related documents(s) #52 Conditional Order) Notice Date 01/28/2021. (Admin.)
January 26, 2021 Filing 52 Consent Order Providing for Debtor's Use of Cash Collateral and Providing Adequate Protection re: (related document(s)#49 Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral filed by Creditor Independence Bank, Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.). (Sweeney, Carolyn)
January 24, 2021 Filing 51 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Martin A. Mooney on behalf of TD Auto Finance LLC. (Mooney, Martin)
January 22, 2021 Filing 50 Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period December 2020 Filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Bank Accounts #2 Reconciliation Reports #3 Profit and Loss Statement) (Quinn, Thomas)
January 14, 2021 Document terminated - (related document(s):#48 Motion to Approve filed by Creditor Independence Bank, Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.) (Sweeney, Carolyn)
January 13, 2021 Filing 49 Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral filed by Gracie's Ventures, Inc., Independence Bank. Objections to Motion due: 01/20/2021, plus an additional 3 days if served by regular mail. (Attachments: #1 Consent Order Providing for Debtor's Use of Cash Collateral and Providing Adequate Protection)If this is an Emergency Motion, the objection deadline will not apply and a new deadline will be set by the court. See Local Bankruptcy Rule 9013-2(d)(2)(C). (Quinn, Thomas)
January 12, 2021 Filing 48 **TERMINATED ** Motion to Approve filed by Gracie's Ventures, Inc., Independence Bank. Objections to Motion due: 01/26/2021, plus an additional 3 days if served by mail or otherwise allowed under FRBP 9006(f). (Attachments: #1 Consent Order Providing for Debtor's Use of Cash Collateral and Providing Adequate Protection)If this is an Emergency Motion, the objection deadline will not apply and a new deadline will be set by the court. See Local Bankruptcy Rule 9013-2(d)(2)(C). (Quinn, Thomas) Modified text on 1/14/2021 (Sweeney, Carolyn).
January 10, 2021 Filing 47 BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE:related documents(s) #46 Order on Motion For Authority) Notice Date 01/10/2021. (Admin.)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order Granting (Related Doc #30) Motion For Authority to Apply Retainer to Services Rendered by Counsel filed by Gracie's Ventures, Inc. (Ricciarelli, Pam)
January 7, 2021 Filing 45 BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE:related documents(s) #44 Order on Motion to Amend Application) Notice Date 01/07/2021. (Admin.)
January 7, 2021 Meeting Held and Adjourned meeting held on January 5, 2020 (related document(s)#10 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12). (Donahue, Gary) Filed by Trustee
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order Granting #26 Amended Application/Motion to Employ Thomas P. Quinn, Esq. and McLaughlinQuinn LLC as Counsel. Filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc. (Sweeney, Carolyn) Modified text on 1/5/2021 (Sweeney, Carolyn).
January 5, 2021 Filing 43 Certificate of Service Re Notice to Creditors Scheduled as Disputed, Contingent or Unliquidated Filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc. (related document(s)#36 Missing Document(s) Filed filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.). (Quinn, Thomas)
January 4, 2021 Receipt of additional $1.00 towards #38 Amended creditor list, Case(1:20-bk-11269) [misc,instpay7] ( 1.00). Receipt number 3922483, amount $ 1.00. (U.S. Treasury) Modified text on 1/5/2021 (Sweeney, Carolyn).
January 4, 2021 Receipt of additional $1.00 towards #38 Amended creditor list, which was inadvertently charged the old amount of $31.00 Filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.. (Quinn, Thomas) Modified text on 1/4/2021 (Sweeney, Carolyn).
January 2, 2021 Filing 42 BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE:related documents(s) #39 Missing Document(s) Filed filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.) Notice Date 01/02/2021. (Admin.)
January 2, 2021 Filing 41 BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE:related documents(s) #36 Missing Document(s) Filed filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.) Notice Date 01/02/2021. (Admin.)
December 30, 2020 Filing 40 BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE:related documents(s) #35 Order on Motion to Extend Time) Notice Date 12/30/2020. (Admin.)
December 30, 2020 Filing 39 **Terminated per Attorney Request - Duplicate of #36** Missing Document(s) Filed: Schedule A-B Schedule D, Schedule E-F, Schedule G Schedule H Summary of Assets and Liabilities Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules, Stmt of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Atty Compensation, Filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.. (Quinn, Thomas) Modified text on 12/30/2020 (Lanni, Christine).
December 30, 2020 Filing 38 Amended Creditor List Fee Amount $31 Filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Quinn, Thomas)
December 30, 2020 Filing 37 Amended Schedule(s)/Statements filed: Ch. 11 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors [Fee Due No] Filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Quinn, Thomas)
December 30, 2020 Filing 36 Missing Document(s) Filed: Schedule A-B Schedule D, Schedule E-F, Schedule G Schedule H Summary of Assets and Liabilities Stmt of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Atty Compensation, Filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.. (Quinn, Thomas)
December 30, 2020 Receipt of filing fee for Amended List of Creditors(1:20-bk-11269) [misc,amdmtx] ( 31.00). Receipt number 3921520, amount $ 31.00. (U.S. Treasury)
December 30, 2020 Document terminated - **Per Attorney Request - duplicate of doc #36** (related document(s):#39 Missing Document(s) Filed filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.) (Lanni, Christine)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order Granting (Related Doc #33) Motion to Extend Time to 12/30/2020 to File Missing Documents Updated deadline due by: 12/30/2020. **See Order for details** (Ricciarelli, Pam)
December 23, 2020 Filing 34 BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE:related documents(s) #32 Hearing (Bk)) Notice Date 12/23/2020. (Admin.)
December 23, 2020 Filing 33 Motion to Extend Time until December 30, 2020 to file missing schedules filed by Gracie's Ventures, Inc. (Related document(s) #6 14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents). Objection period will be left to the discretion of the court. (Quinn, Thomas). Modified Link on 12/28/2020 (Ricciarelli, Pam).
December 21, 2020 Filing 32 Hearing Set (re#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.). Section 105 Status hearing to be held via Zoom.gov video platform on 2/24/2021 at 10:00 AM (Sweeney, Carolyn)
December 21, 2020 Filing 31 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/21/2020 10:01:33 AM ]. File Size [ 6255 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:26:04 ]. (admin).
December 21, 2020 Filing 30 Motion For Authority to Apply Retainer to Services Rendered by Counsel filed by Gracie's Ventures, Inc.. Objections to Motion due: 01/4/2021, plus an additional 3 days if served by mail or otherwise allowed under FRBP 9006(f). If this is an Emergency Motion, the objection deadline will not apply and a new deadline will be set by the court. See Local Bankruptcy Rule 9013-2(d)(2)(C). (Quinn, Thomas)
December 21, 2020 Section 105(d) Status Hearing Held (related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.). APPEARANCES: Thomas Quinn, Gary Donahue, Daniel Burgoyne. Background of case given. Status hearing to be held in February 2021. (Sweeney, Carolyn)
December 17, 2020 Filing 29 BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE:related documents(s) #28 Order on Motion to Extend Time) Notice Date 12/17/2020. (Admin.)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order Granting #27 Motion to Extend Time to 12/23/2020 to file missing schedules filed by Gracie's Ventures, Inc. (related document(s) #6 14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents) . Updated deadline due by: 12/23/2020. (Sweeney, Carolyn)
December 14, 2020 Filing 27 Motion to Extend Time until December 23, 2020 to file missing schedules filed by Gracie's Ventures, Inc. (related document(s)#6 14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents). Objection period will be left to the discretion of the court. (Quinn, Thomas)
December 11, 2020 Filing 26 Amended Application/Motion to Employ Thomas P. Quinn, Esq. and McLaughlinQuinn LLC as Counsel (re#18 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.). filed by Gracie's Ventures, Inc. (related document(s)#18 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.). Objections to Motion due: 12/28/2020, plus an additional 3 days if served by mail or otherwise allowed under FRBP 9006(f). (Attachments: #1 Amended Affidavit of Proposed Counsel)If this is an Emergency Motion, the objection deadline will not apply and a new deadline will be set by the court. See Local Bankruptcy Rule 9013-2(d)(2)(C). (Quinn, Thomas)
December 8, 2020 TEXT ONLY Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Patrick John McDonald IV on behalf of BayCoast Bank. (McDonald, Patrick)
December 8, 2020 TEXT ONLY Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Thomas J Enright on behalf of Efe Kultur. (Enright, Thomas)
December 8, 2020 TEXT ONLY Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Thomas J Enright on behalf of Luis Morales. (Enright, Thomas)
December 7, 2020 Filing 25 Cash Flow Statement for Small Business Filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.. (Quinn, Thomas)
December 7, 2020 Filing 24 Cash Flow Statement for Small Business Filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.. (Quinn, Thomas)
December 7, 2020 Filing 23 Statement of Operations for Small Business Filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.. (Quinn, Thomas)
December 7, 2020 Filing 22 Balance Sheet Filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.. (Quinn, Thomas)
December 7, 2020 Filing 21 RESTRICTED ACCESS! Tax Documents for the Year 2019 Filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.. (Quinn, Thomas)
December 7, 2020 TEXT ONLY Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by James G. Atchison on behalf of Artist Group LLC, HM Ventures Group 8 LLC. (Atchison, James)
December 6, 2020 Filing 20 BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE:related documents(s) #17 BNC Service of Document) Notice Date 12/06/2020. (Admin.)
December 5, 2020 Filing 19 BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE:related documents(s) #11 BNC Service of Document) Notice Date 12/05/2020. (Admin.)
December 4, 2020 Filing 18 **This application has been amended - see doc #26** Application to Employ Thomas P. Quinn, Esquire and McLaughlinQuinn LLC as Counsel filed by Gracie's Ventures, Inc.. Objections to Motion due: 12/18/2020, plus an additional 3 days if served by mail or otherwise allowed under FRBP 9006(f). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Proposed Counsel)If this is an Emergency Motion, the objection deadline will not apply and a new deadline will be set by the court. See Local Bankruptcy Rule 9013-2(d)(2)(C). (Quinn, Thomas) Modified text on 12/15/2020 (Sweeney, Carolyn).
December 4, 2020 Filing 17 BNC Service of Document. (related document(s)#12 Trustee Document filed by Assistant U.S. Trustee Gary L. Donahue). 341 notice mailed to all parties/creditors. (Sweeney, Carolyn)
December 4, 2020 Document terminated - (related document(s):#9 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.) Document to be re-filed. (Sweeney, Carolyn)
December 4, 2020 TEXT ONLY Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Daniel E. Burgoyne on behalf of Independence Bank. (Burgoyne, Daniel)
December 3, 2020 Filing 16 BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE:related documents(s) #5 Order) Notice Date 12/03/2020. (Admin.)
December 3, 2020 Filing 15 BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE:related documents(s) #3 Missing Document(s) Filed filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.) Notice Date 12/03/2020. (Admin.)
December 3, 2020 Filing 14 BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE:related documents(s) #2 Missing Document(s) Filed filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.) Notice Date 12/03/2020. (Admin.)
December 3, 2020 Filing 13 BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE:related documents(s) #7 Chapter 11 and Notice) Notice Date 12/03/2020. (Admin.)
December 3, 2020 Filing 12 Trustee Document Telephonic dial information for meeting of creditors. (Donahue, Gary) Filed by Trustee
December 3, 2020 Filing 11 BNC Service of Document. (related document(s) #10 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12). 341 notice mailed to all parties/creditors (Sweeney, Carolyn)
December 3, 2020 Filing 10 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/5/2021 at 10:00 AM at Federal Center (Room 620). Proof of Claims due by 3/8/2021. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 3/8/2021. (Sweeney, Carolyn) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2020 (Sweeney, Carolyn).
December 2, 2020 Filing 9 **TERMINATED** Application to Employ Thomas P. Quinn, Esquire and McLaughlinQuinn LLC as Counsel filed by Gracie's Ventures, Inc.. Objections to Motion due: 12/16/2020, plus an additional 3 days if served by mail or otherwise allowed under FRBP 9006(f). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Proposed Counsel)If this is an Emergency Motion, the objection deadline will not apply and a new deadline will be set by the court. See Local Bankruptcy Rule 9013-2(d)(2)(C). (Quinn, Thomas) Modified tezt on 12/4/2020 (Sweeney, Carolyn).
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 Notice to the Court scheduling the meeting of creditors for January 5, 2021 at 10:00 AM. Filed by Gary L. Donahue. (Donahue, Gary)
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 Chapter 11 Order and Notice. Section 105 Status hearing to be held on 12/21/2020 at 10:00 AM via Zoom.gov video platform. Application to Employ Due by: 12/31/2020. Status Check re: Scheduling of 341 Meeting: 12/21/2020. (Ricciarelli, Pam)
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 14 Day Order re: Missing Documents and Automatic Dismissal if documents are not timely filed. (related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.). To view the specific items listed in the Missing Documents Order, click on the document number for this entry. Missing Documents Due By: 12/14/2020, plus an additional 3 days if served by mail or otherwise allowed under FRBP 9006(f). (Davis, Jennifer)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order (Related Documents: #4 Motion for Emergency Hearing filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.) Objections (if any by UST) Due by 12:30 PM on 12/1/2020. **See Order for details** (Ricciarelli, Pam)
December 1, 2020 Judge Diane Finkle added to case (Davis, Jennifer)
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 Motion for Emergency Hearing filed by Gracie's Ventures, Inc. (related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.).Status Check Due by:12/2/2020. If this is an Emergency Motion, the objection deadline will not apply and a new deadline will be set by the court. See Local Bankruptcy Rule 9013-2(d)(2)(C). (Quinn, Thomas)
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 Missing Document(s) Filed: Corporate Vote, Filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.. (Quinn, Thomas)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 Missing Document(s) Filed: Corporate Vote, Filed by Debtor Gracie's Ventures, Inc.. (Quinn, Thomas)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Gracie's Ventures, Inc.. Government Proof of Claim due by 05/29/2021. (Quinn, Thomas)
November 30, 2020 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(1:20-bk-11269) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 3912520, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: Gracie's Ventures, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Gracie's Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: Gary L. Donahue
Represented By: Gary L. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?